EP1702735 - Method and apparatus for fluid jet formation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLOW INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 23500 -64th Avenue South Kent 98032 / US | [2006/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashish, Mohamed, A. 5117 165th Place S.E. Bellevue WA 98006 / US | 02 /
Craigen, Steven, J. 5526 South 300th Place Auburn WA 98001 / US | 03 /
Sciulli, Felice, M. 2712 226th Avenue S.E. Issaquah WA 98029 / US | 04 /
Baba, Yasuo 39-8 Minamiharayama, Minamiharayama-cho, Owariasahi Aichi 488-0068 / JP | [2007/16] |
Former [2006/38] | 01 /
Hashish, Mohamed, A. 5117 165th Place S.E. Bellevue WA 98006 / US | ||
02 /
Craigen, Steven, J. 5526 South 300th Place Auburn WA 98001 / US | |||
03 /
Sciulli, Felice, M. 2712 226th Avenue S.E. Issaquah WA 98029 / US | |||
04 /
Baba, Yasuo 10-21-501 Nishishin Moriyama Nagoya Aichi 463-0055 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06012630.7 | 08.03.2000 | [2006/38] | Priority number, date | US19990275520 | 24.03.1999 Original published format: US 275520 | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1702735 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B26F3/00 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
B26F3/004 (EP,US);
B24C5/04 (EP,US);
Y10T83/0591 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2109 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Fluid-Strahl-Bildung | [2006/38] | English: | Method and apparatus for fluid jet formation | [2006/38] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour former un jet de fluide | [2006/38] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 12.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/17] | 09.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00916244.7 / EP1165249 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2559592 (BUTTON LESLIE M, et al) [X] 1,2,4,21-23,27,29,30* column 1, lines 9-14 *; | [X]GB1236205 (ABRASIVE DEV) [X] 1-10,21-33 * page 1, line 50 - page 2, line 100 * * page 3, lines 7-115 * * figures 3,4 *; | [X]US4218855 (WEMMER OTTO [US]) [X] 1-10,21-33 * the whole document * * page 2, lines 7-115 * * figures 3,4 *; | [X]EP0391500 (FLOW INT CORP [US]) [X] 1-10,21-33 * the whole document *; | [X]US5462605 (SZUECS JOHANN [DE]) [X] 1-10,21-33 * column 1, line 65 - column 3, line 8 * * column 5, lines 43-47 * * figures 1,2 * | Examination | US4666083 |