EP1702638 - Dry powder inhaler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pentafragas, Dimitrios 17 Elaionon Street 190 09 Pikermi Attika / GR | [2006/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Roukounas, Dimitrios, et al 13, Agamemnonos Street 155 61 Holargos, Athens / GR | [2009/42] | Application number, filing date | 06012832.9 | 25.09.2002 | [2006/38] | Priority number, date | GR20020100159 | 29.03.2002 Original published format: GR 2002100159 | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1702638 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1702638 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | [2007/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1702638 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [2006/38] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2006/38] | Extension states | AL | 11.07.2006 | LT | 11.07.2006 | LV | 11.07.2006 | MK | 11.07.2006 | RO | 11.07.2006 | SI | 11.07.2006 | Title | German: | Trockenpulverinhalator | [2006/38] | English: | Dry powder inhaler | [2006/38] | French: | Inhalateur à poudre | [2006/38] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 16.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02767726.9 / EP1467787 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020767726) is 18.02.2005 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.02.2012 | BE | 01.02.2012 | CY | 01.02.2012 | CZ | 01.02.2012 | DK | 01.02.2012 | EE | 01.02.2012 | FI | 01.02.2012 | IT | 01.02.2012 | NL | 01.02.2012 | SE | 01.02.2012 | SK | 01.02.2012 | TR | 01.02.2012 | BG | 01.05.2012 | GR | 02.05.2012 | ES | 12.05.2012 | PT | 01.06.2012 | GB | 25.09.2012 | IE | 25.09.2012 | LU | 25.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | FR | 01.10.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
TR | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
GB | 25.09.2012 | ||
IE | 25.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
GB | 25.09.2012 | ||
IE | 25.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
GB | 25.09.2012 | ||
IE | 25.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
GB | 25.09.2012 | ||
IE | 25.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
IE | 25.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | NL | 01.02.2012 | |
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 01.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0129985 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) [X] 8 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 12; figure 7 * * page 5, line 29 - line 33 * [A] 1-7,9; | [X]WO9834663 (ASTRA AB [SE], et al) [X] 6,8,9* page 7, line 4 - line 19; figure 8 *; | [XA]WO0064779 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 6 * page 10, line 11 - line 24; figure 1 * * page 12, line 12 - line 18; figures 3C,4A,4B * [A] 7 | Examination | US5740794 |