EP1739535 - File system storing transaction records in flash-like media [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QNX Software Systems Limited 1001 Farrar Road Kanata, Ontario K2K 0B3 / CA | [2012/14] |
Former [2011/46] | For all designated states QNX Software Systems Limited 175 Terence Matthews Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K2M 1W8 / CA | ||
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states QNX Software Systems GmbH & Co. KG Am Listholze 76 30177 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states QNX Software Systems GmbH & Co. KG. Becker Göring-Strasse 16 76703 Karlsbad / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dodge, Dan 1370 Normandy Crescent Nepean Ontario K2C 0N5 / CA | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/31] | Hodges, Julia, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street GB-London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06012872.5 | 22.06.2006 | [2007/01] | Priority number, date | US20050173994 | 01.07.2005 Original published format: US 173994 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1739535 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1739535 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | [2009/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1739535 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, G06F17/30 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
G06F3/0679 (EP,US);
G06F9/06 (KR);
G06F16/13 (EP,US);
G06F16/1865 (EP,US);
G06F3/0619 (EP,US);
G06F3/0656 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/06] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dateisystem zum Speichern von Transaktionsdatensätzen in Flash-Speicher-ähnlichen Speichermedien | [2007/01] | English: | File system storing transaction records in flash-like media | [2007/01] | French: | Système de fichiers pour enregistrer des données de transaction dans des supports de stockage de type flash | [2007/01] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 04.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.01.2013 | [2014/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1089176 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-29 * paragraphs [0043] - [0047] ** figures 1,7 *; | [X]US2003163594 (AASHEIM JERED DONALD [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * paragraph [0038] * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0044] , [0063] , [0064] * * figures 4-6 * * paragraphs [0132] - [0137] * * figure 20 * | by applicant | US2003163594 |