EP1742472 - Image processing apparatus, image processing method, and program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kondo Tetsujiro Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Keck, Stephan Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Melzer, Wolfgang, et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06013127.3 | 26.06.2006 | [2007/02] | Priority number, date | JP20050185998 | 27.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005185998 | [2007/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1742472 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1742472 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/01 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
H04N7/0125 (EP,US);
H04N7/01 (KR);
H04N7/0135 (EP,US);
H04N7/0145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [2012/31] |
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Bildverarbeitungsverfahren und Programm | [2007/02] | English: | Image processing apparatus, image processing method, and program | [2007/02] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'image, procédé de traitement d'image et programme | [2007/02] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 24.05.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.06.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6571142 (KONDO TETSUJIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract *; | [I]EP1335596 (SONY CORP [JP]) [I] 1-10 * abstract *; | [AP]US2005253967 (YOSHIDA RIICHIRO [JP]) [AP] 1-10 * abstract ** paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0012] * |