EP1742076 - Method of testing active electrical components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garcia, Felipe Cuenca Rosenweg 1 35099 Burgwald / DE | [2007/02] | Application number, filing date | 06013305.5 | 28.06.2006 | [2007/02] | Priority number, date | DE20051031795 | 07.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005031795 | [2007/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1742076 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1742076 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1742076 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/02, G01R31/327, G01R31/28, G01D3/08 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
G01D3/08 (EP,US);
G01R31/2829 (EP);
G01R31/2836 (EP);
G01R31/50 (EP,US);
G01R31/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/02] | G01R31/327 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/07] |
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Prüfen von aktiven elektrotechnischen Komponenten | [2007/02] | English: | Method of testing active electrical components | [2007/02] | French: | Procédé de vérification de composants électrotechniques actifs | [2007/02] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 06.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2006 | CY | 17.04.2019 | CZ | 17.04.2019 | DK | 17.04.2019 | EE | 17.04.2019 | ES | 17.04.2019 | FI | 17.04.2019 | LT | 17.04.2019 | LV | 17.04.2019 | MC | 17.04.2019 | NL | 17.04.2019 | PL | 17.04.2019 | RO | 17.04.2019 | SE | 17.04.2019 | SI | 17.04.2019 | SK | 17.04.2019 | TR | 17.04.2019 | IE | 28.06.2019 | LU | 28.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | BG | 17.07.2019 | GR | 18.07.2019 | IS | 17.08.2019 | PT | 19.08.2019 | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 28.06.2019 | ||
LU | 28.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 19.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 17.04.2019 | |
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 28.06.2019 | ||
LU | 28.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 19.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | CZ | 17.04.2019 | |
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 28.06.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 19.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 17.04.2019 | |
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 19.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | CZ | 17.04.2019 | |
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 19.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | CZ | 17.04.2019 | |
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 19.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 17.04.2019 | |
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 19.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 19.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 19.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 19.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 17.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9113365 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE19922818 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [DA] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE10155847 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0028]; figure 2 * | Examination | DE10062333 | by applicant | DE3741901 | DE19922818 | DE10155847 | DE10339805 |