EP1701022 - Method for determining the composition of a gas mixture in a combustion chamber of an internal combustion engine with exhaust gas recirculation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nitzke, Hans-Georg Wischhop 2 38547 Wettmershagen / DE | 02 /
Rebohl, Thorsten Kiebitzmoor 3 38327 Meine / DE | 03 /
Jeschke, Jens Nordstrasse 1 38106 Braunschweig / DE | [2006/52] |
Former [2006/37] | 01 /
Nitzke, Hans-Georg Wischhop 2 38547 Wettmershagen / DE | ||
02 /
Rebohl, Thorsten Breite Strasse 9 38100 Braunschweig / DE | |||
03 /
Jeschke, Jens Nordstrasse 1 38106 Braunschweig / DE | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06013404.6 | 11.11.2002 | [2006/37] | Priority number, date | DE2001158262 | 28.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10158262 | DE2001158247 | 28.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10158247 | DE2001158261 | 28.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10158261 | DE2001158250 | 28.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10158250 | DE2001158249 | 28.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10158249 | [2006/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1701022 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1701022 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02D21/08, F02D41/18 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
F02D41/0007 (EP,US);
F02D41/0072 (EP,US);
F02D41/145 (EP,US);
F02D41/18 (EP,US);
F02M26/46 (EP,US);
F02M26/47 (EP,US);
F02D2041/1433 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0402 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0406 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0408 (EP,US);
F02D2200/703 (EP,US);
F02M26/05 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Zusammensetzung des Gasgemisches in einem Brennraum eines Verbrennungsmotors mit Abgasrückführung | [2006/37] | English: | Method for determining the composition of a gas mixture in a combustion chamber of an internal combustion engine with exhaust gas recirculation | [2006/37] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer la composition d'un mélange gazeux dans une chambre de combustion d'un moteur à combustion interne comprenant une conduite de recyclage des gaz d'échappement | [2006/37] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 04.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.09.2011 | 26.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/50] | 05.08.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 14.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02790353.3 / EP1507967 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020790353) is 09.03.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9735106 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9 * abstract * * page 9, line 18 - page 11, line 1 * [Y] 4; | [X]WO9914476 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9 * the whole document * * figure 5 ** page 15, lines 1-22 *; | [X]US6035639 (KOLMANOVSKY ILYA V [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 20 *; | [Y]EP1020624 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [Y] 4 * abstract * * claims 1-4 * | Examination | DE19963358 |