EP1742387 - Electrical switching device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Industries GmbH Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11 53115 Bonn / DE | [2010/26] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Eaton Industies GmbH Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11 53115 Bonn / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states Moeller GmbH Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11 53115 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freyermuth, Thomas Hilberather Strasse 74 53505 Kalenbom / DE | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Leadbetter, Benedict Eaton Industries Manufacturing GmbH Patent Law Department Route de la Longeraie 7 1110 Morges VD / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Leadbetter, Benedict Eaton Industries Manufacturing GmbH Patent Law Department Route de la Longeraie 7 1110 Morges VD / CH | Application number, filing date | 06013882.3 | 05.07.2006 | [2007/02] | Priority number, date | DE20051031268 | 05.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005031268 | [2007/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1742387 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1742387 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1742387 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/00 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
H04B10/801 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Title | German: | Elektrische Schalteinrichtung | [2007/02] | English: | Electrical switching device | [2007/02] | French: | Système de commutation électrique | [2007/02] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.09.2010 | CZ | 08.09.2010 | DK | 08.09.2010 | EE | 08.09.2010 | HU | 08.09.2010 | IE | 08.09.2010 | LT | 08.09.2010 | LV | 08.09.2010 | NL | 08.09.2010 | RO | 08.09.2010 | SI | 08.09.2010 | SK | 08.09.2010 | BG | 08.12.2010 | GR | 09.12.2010 | IS | 08.01.2011 | PT | 10.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/42] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CZ | 08.09.2010 | |
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CZ | 08.09.2010 | |
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CZ | 08.09.2010 | |
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | IE | 08.09.2010 | |
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | LT | 08.09.2010 | |
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | LT | 08.09.2010 | |
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | LT | 08.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9627211 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 3, line 15 - line 29; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19908574 (MOELLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* figure 5 *; | [Y]US2002054410 (ISHIKAWA YOZO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0048] , [0050]; figures 5A,5B,11A * | by applicant | DE3019646 | WO9627211 | DE19817441 | US2002054410 |