EP1777363 - Stop device for a door of a housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rittal GmbH & Co. KG Auf dem Stützelberg 35745 Herborn / DE | [2007/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benner, Rolf Wilhelmstrasse 8 35745 Herborn-Amdorf / DE | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Tönhardt, Marion, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | Tönhardt, Marion, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/17] | Fleck, Hermann-Joseph Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 06013994.6 | 06.07.2006 | [2007/17] | Priority number, date | DE20051050639 | 20.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005050639 | [2007/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1777363 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1777363 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1777363 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E05F5/04, // E05C17/02 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
E05F5/04 (EP,US);
E05C17/025 (EP,US);
E05C17/50 (EP,US);
E05F2005/046 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/208 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/17] | E05F5/04 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [2011/10] |
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Arretieren einer Tür eines Gehäuses | [2007/17] | English: | Stop device for a door of a housing | [2007/17] | French: | Dispositif d'arrêt pour une porte d'un boîtier | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 30.12.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.02.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.11.2011 | [2012/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE24388 (O. HERRMANN) [I] 1-3,14,19 * page 1, lines 9-25 * * figures 1,2 *; | [YA]GB189810031 (STANSBURY ALFRED LEWIS, et al) [Y] 20 * page 2, lines 16-27 * * figures 2,3 * [A] 13-15; | [X]DE407751 (HEINRICH DILLENIUS) [X] 1,2,14 * page 1, lines 49-57 * * figures 1,3 *; | [Y]DE551217 (RUDOLF ASSMANN) [Y] 4 * page 1, lines 56-65 * * page 2, lines 14-22 * * figures 1,3 *; | [IY]DE19832578 (GOROSHANIN GENADI [DE]) [I] 1,2,13-15,17-19 * column 2, lines 26-32 * * column 3, lines 2-15 * * figures 2,6 * [Y] 4; | [A]FR2790504 (MICHAUX MICHEL [FR]) [A] 5-12 * page 2, lines 8-14 ** figures 1,3 *; | [XY]US2003057711 (LAPORTA GIOVANNI MARIA [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,5,13-17,19 * paragraphs [0001] , [0027] - [0031] - [0034] * * figures 1,2,4,5 * [Y] 20 |