EP1741689 - Container, especially a compost container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albrecht Braun GmbH Postfach 11 17 73338 Amstetten / DE | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Albrecht Lange Lemppen 34 D-89075 Ulm / DE | 02 /
Braun, Wilfried Bahnhofstrasse 1-3 D-89173 Lonsee / DE | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Popp, Eugen, et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06014128.0 | 07.07.2006 | [2007/02] | Priority number, date | DE20052010721U | 07.07.2005 Original published format: DE 202005010721 U | [2007/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1741689 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1741689 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C05F17/02, C05F9/04, B65D6/24 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
C05F17/907 (EP);
Y02P20/145 (EP);
Y02W30/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/34] |
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Behälter, insbesondere Kompostbehälter | [2007/02] | English: | Container, especially a compost container | [2007/02] | French: | Récipient, notamment pour compost | [2007/02] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/50] | 24.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH267964 (TRABER HERZOG EUGEN [CH]) [Y] 2,12 * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 1, line 27 - line 33 * * page 1, line 28 - line 41 * * figure 5 *; | [A]DE7733234U (FA. PETER HAFFKE, 5090 LEVERKUSEN) [A] 1,10* claim 1 *; | [A]FR2480709 (VMW RANSHOFEN BERNDORF AG [AT]) [A] 1,10 * page 2, line 1 - line 5 *; | [XY]BE905092 (JH REMACLE S A ETS) [X] 1,3-11,13 * page 1, line 1 - line 2 * * figure 1 * * claim 7 * * page 2, line 11 - line 17 * * page 1, line 11 - line 14 * * page 3, line 5 - line 11 * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 4 * [Y] 2,12 |