EP1876368 - Method of manufacturing a clutch disc for a clutch and a clutch disc [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Radic, Anita Adam-Lang-Strasse 14 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | [2008/02] | Application number, filing date | 06014189.2 | 08.07.2006 | [2008/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1876368 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1876368 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/64 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
F16D13/64 (EP);
F16D2013/642 (EP);
F16D2250/00 (EP);
F16D2300/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung der Kupplungsscheibe einer Kupplungseinrichtung und Kupplungsscheibe | [2008/02] | English: | Method of manufacturing a clutch disc for a clutch and a clutch disc | [2008/02] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une disque d'embrayage et une disque d'embrayage | [2008/02] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.12.2010 | CZ | 15.12.2010 | DK | 15.12.2010 | EE | 15.12.2010 | FI | 15.12.2010 | HU | 15.12.2010 | IE | 15.12.2010 | IT | 15.12.2010 | LT | 15.12.2010 | LV | 15.12.2010 | NL | 15.12.2010 | PL | 15.12.2010 | RO | 15.12.2010 | SE | 15.12.2010 | SI | 15.12.2010 | SK | 15.12.2010 | TR | 15.12.2010 | BG | 15.03.2011 | GR | 16.03.2011 | ES | 26.03.2011 | IS | 15.04.2011 | PT | 15.04.2011 | AT | 08.07.2011 | GB | 08.07.2011 | LU | 08.07.2011 | BE | 31.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
TR | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
AT | 08.07.2011 | ||
GB | 08.07.2011 | ||
LU | 08.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
AT | 08.07.2011 | ||
GB | 08.07.2011 | ||
LU | 08.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
AT | 08.07.2011 | ||
GB | 08.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
GB | 08.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 15.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19634534 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [X] 1-20 * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 18 *; | [DX]US5810969 (MARCHISSEAU MICHEL [FR], et al) [DX] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE10002261 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [DA] 4-9,13-20* column 3, line 11 - line 40; claim - * | Examination | DE3619894 |