EP1796131 - Ultra-thin liquid control plate and combination of box-like member and the control plate for electron microscopy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contrel Technology Co., Ltd. 3F, No. 6 Nanke 5th Rd., Tainan Science Park Sinshin Township, Tainan County 744 / TW | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states Lee, Bing-Huan 1F., No. 2, Lane 46, Benguan Road Niaosong Township Kaohsiung County 833, Taiwan, R.O.C. / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chao, Chih-Yu 5F., No. 8, Lane 53 Sec. 4, Sinyi Rd. Da-an District Taipei City 106 R.O.C. / TW | 02 /
Hsien, Wen-Jiunn No. 13, Alley 2 Lane 3 Jhongsiao St. Jhonghe City Taipei County 235 R.O.C. / TW | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06014484.7 | 12.07.2006 | [2007/24] | Priority number, date | CN200510130412 | 09.12.2005 Original published format: CN200510130412 | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1796131 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1796131 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/20 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
H01J37/20 (EP);
H01J2237/2003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2011/25] |
Former [2007/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kontrollplatte für ultra-dünnen Flüssigkeitsfilm und Kombination aus dieser Kontrollplatte mit einem Behälter für die Elektronenmikroskopie | [2007/24] | English: | Ultra-thin liquid control plate and combination of box-like member and the control plate for electron microscopy | [2007/24] | French: | Plaque de contrôle d'une couche ultra-mince de liquide et combinaison de cette plaque avec contenant pour la microscopie électronique | [2007/24] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/40] | 23.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2005174657 (CANON KK) [Y] 1,6,8,11-13,17,18 * paragraphs [0028] - [0033]; figures 1(a), 1(b) *; | [Y]US4163900 (KUNDRATH MICHAEL R [US], et al) [Y] 1,6,8,17,18 * column 1, lines 18-23; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4139668 (WARD III WILLIAM J) [X] 1,9,10,17,20 * column 1, lines 6-9 * * column 3, lines 30-32 * * column 4, lines 31-64 * * claim 9 * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US5326971 (THEODORE N DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 11-13 * column 3, lines 58-68; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2004003666 (FISCHIONE PAUL E [US], et al) [Y] 21-23,25 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006]; figures 1,2,5,6 *; | [Y]JP2004038362 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL) [Y] 21-23,25 * paragraphs [0031] , [0064]; figures 3(b),9(b) *; | [Y]US5698856 (FRASCA PETER [US]) [Y] 21-23,25 * figures 1-3 * | [Y] - FLOWER H M, "High voltage electron microscopy of environmental reactions", JOURNAL OF MICROSCOPY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (19730101), vol. 97, no. 1/2, ISSN 0022-2720, pages 171 - 190, XP009087674 [Y] 11-13 * figure 2(a) * |