EP1726485 - Collapsible storage apparatus for vehicle cargo compartments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Collins & Aikman Plastics, Inc. 5755 New King Court Troy, MI 48098 / US | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gehring, Thomas F.J. 20 Dunmurray Boulevard Scarborough Ontario M1T 2J9 / CA | 02 /
Jankowski, Eric 96 Formosa Drive Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1T1 / CA | 03 /
Havidic, Dejan 77 Erskine Avenue Apartment 107 Toronto Ontario M4P 1Y5 / CA | 04 /
Flaman, Brian 50 Stephanie Street Apartment 1411 Toronto Ontario M5T 1B3 / CA | [2007/01] |
Former [2006/48] | 01 /
Gehring, Thomas F.J. 20 Dunmurray Boulevard Scarborough Ontario M1T 2J9 / CA | ||
02 /
Jankowski, Eric 95 Formosa Drive Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1T1 / CA | |||
03 /
Havidic, Dejan 77 Erskine Avenue Apartment 107 Toronto Ontario M4P 1Y5 / CA | |||
04 /
Flaman, Brian 50 Stephanie Street Apartment 1411 Toronto Ontario M5T 1B3 / CA | Representative(s) | Boakes, Jason Carrington, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Boakes, Jason Carrington, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | ||
Former [2007/33] | Boakes, Jason Carrington, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York, YO1 6JX / GB | ||
Former [2006/48] | Boakes, Jason Carrington Harrison Goddard Foote 31 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06014652.9 | 29.06.2001 | [2006/48] | Priority number, date | US20000214947P | 29.06.2000 Original published format: US 214947 P | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1726485 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1726485 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60R7/02 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
B60R7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2006/48] | Title | German: | Zusammenklappbare Stauraumeinrichtung für Fahrzeuggepäckräume | [2006/48] | English: | Collapsible storage apparatus for vehicle cargo compartments | [2006/48] | French: | Appareil de stockage repliable pour compartiment à bagages de véhicules | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 07.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/02] | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01950756.5 / EP1296853 | EP04007002.1 / EP1431122 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2007 | 30.06.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PAX]US6145447 (HENDERSON ROBERT [US]) [PA] 1-4 * abstract * * figure - * [PX] 20,27; | [X]US6050202 (THOMPSON JOSEPH M [US]) [X] 20,27 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US4969793 (PAWL E TIMOTHY [US]) [X] 20,27 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5961171 (IIJIMA SHUNICHI [JP]) [X] 5-9,19,26 * abstract * * column 7, lines 18-47 * * figures 15-17 *; | [X]EP0864466 (PRINCE CORP [US]) [X] 10-13,18,25,28 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 49 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]FR2743344 (TANGUY ALAIN JEAN PIERRE YVES [FR]) [X] 10,12,28 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0983902 (NISSAN EUROP TECH CENTRE [GB]) [X] 14-17,21-24 * paragraphs [0010] - [0015] * * figures 1-9 *; | [X]GB2267876 (DARWEN BARRY GRAHAM [GB]) [X] 10,12,28 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US5392972 (CARUSO PAUL C [US], et al) [X] 14-16,21-23 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * |