EP1720128 - Identifying intrinsic pixel colors in a region of uncertain pixels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADOBE SYSTEMS INCORPORATED 345 Park Avenue San Jose California 95110-2704 / US | [2006/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilensky, Greg 329 N. First Street Apt. 307 San Jose, California 95110 / US | 02 /
Newell, Martin E. 410 Adobe Place Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2006/45] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06015080.2 | 25.04.2000 | [2006/45] | Priority number, date | US19990298872 | 26.04.1999 Original published format: US 298872 | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1720128 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1720128 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1720128 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, G06T11/00 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
G06T11/001 (EP,US);
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T7/143 (EP,US);
G06T7/187 (EP,US);
G06T7/194 (EP,US);
G06V10/267 (EP,US);
G06V10/28 (EP,US);
G06V10/56 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20101 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20104 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/45] | G06T5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2006/45] | Title | German: | Identifizierung intrinsischer Pixelfarben innerhalb eines Bereichs unsicherer Pixel | [2006/45] | English: | Identifying intrinsic pixel colors in a region of uncertain pixels | [2006/45] | French: | Identification de couleurs de pixel intrinsèque dans une zone de pixels incertains | [2006/45] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00303473.3 / EP1049047 | Divisional application(s) | EP09011875.3 / EP2128814 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2013/48] |
Former [2011/17] | GB | 25.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5710839 (COK RONALD S [US]) [X] 1-14 * figures 3,4,10 * * figures 19,20 * * column 2, line 5 - line 14 * * column 3, line 8 - line 18 * * column 3, line 62 - line 67 *; | [X] - ROSENFELD A ET AL, Digital picture processing, DIGITAL PICTURE PROCESSING, ORLANDO, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, PAGE(S) 276-281, (1982), XP002460016 [X] 1,13,14 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5710839 |