EP1746855 - System and method for transmitting resource allocation information in a communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Won, Jong-Hyun Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Chang, Jae-Hwan Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Park, Jeong-Hoon Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Lee, Kang-Gyu Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Yim, Do-Hyon Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2013/04] |
Former [2007/04] | 01 /
Won, Jong-Hyun Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Chang, Jae-Hwan Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Park, Jeong-Hoon Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Lee, Kang-Gyu Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
Yim, Do-Hyon Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06015162.8 | 20.07.2006 | [2007/04] | Priority number, date | KR20050066071 | 20.07.2005 Original published format: KR 20050066071 | KR20050082403 | 05.09.2005 Original published format: KR 20050082403 | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1746855 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1746855 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | [2011/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1746855 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04L1/18, H04L5/00 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
H04L1/1867 (EP,US);
H04L1/18 (KR);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04L1/1896 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04L5/0091 (EP,US);
H04L1/1607 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04L5/0064 (EP,US);
H04W72/21 (EP,US);
H04W8/24 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04W88/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/04] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Übertragung von Betriebsmittelzuteilung-Informationen in einem Kommunikationssystem | [2007/04] | English: | System and method for transmitting resource allocation information in a communication system | [2007/04] | French: | Système et procédé de transmission d'informations d'affectation de ressources dans un système de communications | [2007/04] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 09.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10002530.3 / EP2190250 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.07.2006 | BE | 23.01.2013 | CY | 23.01.2013 | DK | 23.01.2013 | EE | 23.01.2013 | FI | 23.01.2013 | LT | 23.01.2013 | LV | 23.01.2013 | MC | 23.01.2013 | RO | 23.01.2013 | SE | 23.01.2013 | SI | 23.01.2013 | SK | 23.01.2013 | TR | 23.01.2013 | BG | 23.04.2013 | GR | 24.04.2013 | ES | 04.05.2013 | IS | 23.05.2013 | PT | 23.05.2013 | IE | 20.07.2013 | LU | 20.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | BE | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
IE | 20.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | BE | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
IE | 20.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | BE | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | BE | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | BE | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | BE | 23.01.2013 | |
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | BE | 23.01.2013 | |
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | BE | 23.01.2013 | |
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | BE | 23.01.2013 | |
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | BE | 23.01.2013 | |
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | BE | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 23.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005117536 (CHO SUNG-HYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [XP]EP1679932 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [XP] 1* table 24 *; | [X] - Hang Zhang et al., "Traffic Channel Definition for HARQ Burst Allocation in OFDMA PHY", (20050309), IEEE 802.16 Broadband wireless Access Working Group, URL: http://wirelessman.org/tge/contrib/C80216e-05_120.pdf, (20101218), XP002614735 [X] 1,4,6,11,13,14,17,18 * pages 1,2; table 285m * | [A] - "Part 16: Air Interface for fixed and mobile broadband wireless access systems . Amendments for physical and medium access control layers for combined fixed and mobile operation in licensed bands, IEEE P802.16e/D5a", INTERNET CITATION, (20041223), XP002376580 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | [XP] - Jonghyun Won, jaehwan Chang, "Improving HARQ MAP Decoding Efficiency", (20050720), IEEE 802.16 Broadband wireless Access Working Group, URL: http://www.ieee802.org/16/tge/contrib/C80216e-05_371r1.pdf, (20101218), XP002614692 [XP] 1-19 * the whole document * |