EP1748413 - Image processing circuit and image processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/05] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oura, Hisaharu Melco Display Technology Incorp. 997 Miyoshi Goshi-shi Kumamoto 861-1198 / JP | [2007/05] | Representative(s) | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/05] | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06015231.1 | 21.07.2006 | [2007/05] | Priority number, date | JP20050216994 | 27.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005216994 | [2007/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1748413 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [2007/05] | CPC: |
G09G3/3611 (EP,US);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G09G2320/0252 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0271 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0276 (EP,US);
G09G2340/16 (EP,US);
G09G3/2018 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2007/40] |
Former [2007/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsschaltung und Bildverarbeitungsverfahren | [2007/05] | English: | Image processing circuit and image processing method | [2007/05] | French: | Circuit et procédé de traitement dimages | [2007/05] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 24.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 05.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002175907 (SEKIYA KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0002] , [0013] , [0035] , [0065] , [0067] , [0068] *; | [X]EP1465149 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-6 * figure 10 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0015] , [0016] , [0088] , [0014] , [0125] , [0178] *; | [X]EP1467346 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0065] , [0070] - [0079] * * figures 13,15 *; | [PA]US2006152501 (FURIHATA HIROBUMI [JP], et al) [PA] 1-6 * figure 1 ** paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0009] * | Examination | US2002057249 |