EP1746177 - High strength bolt excellent in delayed fracture resistance and method of production of same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | ||
For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | |||
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | ||
For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Suguru, c/o Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | 02 /
Tarui, Toshimi, c/o Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | 03 /
Kubota, Manabu c/o Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | 04 /
Matsuda, Hideki, c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | 05 /
Ohya, Tadashi, c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | 06 /
Mizuno, Koki, c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/04] | 01 /
Yoshida, Suguru, c/o Nippon Steel Corporation Tech. Dev. Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | ||
02 /
Tarui, Toshimi, c/o Nippon Steel Corporation Tech. Dev. Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | |||
03 /
Kubota, Manabu c/o Nippon Steel Corporation Tech. Dev. Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | |||
04 /
Matsuda, Hideki, c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | |||
05 /
Ohya, Tadashi, c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | |||
06 /
Mizuno, Koki, c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/04] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06015360.8 | 24.07.2006 | [2007/04] | Priority number, date | JP20050212216 | 22.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005212216 | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1746177 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1746177 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/12, B21K1/56 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
B21K1/46 (EP,US);
B21H3/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/12 (EP,US);
F16B35/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/39] |
Former [2007/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hochfester Schraubbolzen mit verzögerter Bruchfestigkeit und dessen Herstellungsverfahren | [2007/04] | English: | High strength bolt excellent in delayed fracture resistance and method of production of same | [2007/04] | French: | Boulon a haute resistance mecanique et resistance a la rupture retardée et procedee de production | [2007/04] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 24.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3489620 (CURRENT FARMER L) [A] 1-8; | [A]JPH05287440 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]JPH07292434 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]JPH07300652 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]JPH09263875 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [A]JP2000337332 (KOBE STEEL LTD, et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [X]JP2001032044 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] - [0045] * | by applicant | JPS6164815 | JPS644566B | JP2000026934 | JP3243744B | JP3243745B | - TETSU-TO-HAGANE, (1997), vol. 83, page 454 |