EP1748219 - Drive belt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van der Meer, Cornelis Johannes Maria Dieze 99 5032 XG Tilburg / NL | [2007/05] | Representative(s) | Plevier, Gabriël Anton Johan Maria Bosch Transmission Technology B.V. PO Box 500 5000 AM Tilburg / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | Plevier, Gabriel Anton Johan Maria Bosch Transmission Technology B.V. PO Box 500 5000 AM Tilburg / NL | ||
Former [2007/05] | Plevier, Gabriel Anton Johan Maria Van Doorne's Transmissie B.V., Patents Department, Postbus 500 5000 AM Tilburg / NL | Application number, filing date | 06015763.3 | 28.07.2006 | [2007/05] | Priority number, date | WO2005NL00563 | 29.07.2005 Original published format: PCT/NL2005/000563 | [2007/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1748219 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1748219 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | [2007/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1748219 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16G5/16 | [2007/05] | CPC: |
F16G5/16 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/05] | Title | German: | Treibriemen | [2007/05] | English: | Drive belt | [2007/05] | French: | Courroie de transmission | [2007/05] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 10.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.07.2006 | AT | 25.12.2013 | BE | 25.12.2013 | BG | 25.12.2013 | CY | 25.12.2013 | CZ | 25.12.2013 | DK | 25.12.2013 | EE | 25.12.2013 | ES | 25.12.2013 | FI | 25.12.2013 | IT | 25.12.2013 | LT | 25.12.2013 | LV | 25.12.2013 | MC | 25.12.2013 | PL | 25.12.2013 | RO | 25.12.2013 | SE | 25.12.2013 | SI | 25.12.2013 | SK | 25.12.2013 | TR | 25.12.2013 | GR | 26.03.2014 | IS | 25.04.2014 | PT | 28.04.2014 | IE | 28.07.2014 | LU | 28.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.07.2006 | |
AT | 25.12.2013 | ||
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 25.12.2013 | |
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 25.12.2013 | |
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 25.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1179690 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0018] * * figure 3 * [Y] 4-6; | [Y]US2004127319 (BRANDSMA ARJEN [NL], et al) [Y] 4,5 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0020] , [0023] *; | [Y]EP1184591 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * claims 1-3 * | by applicant | EP1111271 | JPS63266247 | WO9804847 |