EP1731140 - Medicinal aerosol formulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aeropharm Technology Incorporated Raritan Center, Campus Plaza, 18 Mayfield Avenue Edison, NJ 08818 / US | [2006/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adjei, Akwete 15 Tillman Court Bridgewater NJ 08807 / US | 02 /
Cutie, Anthony J. P.O. Box 6725 Bridgewater NJ 08807 / US | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/50] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06016853.1 | 17.09.1999 | [2006/50] | Priority number, date | US19980158369 | 22.09.1998 Original published format: US 158369 | [2006/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1731140 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1731140 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1731140 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/12 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
A61K9/008 (EP,US);
A61K47/183 (EP,US);
A61K47/20 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/50] | Title | German: | Medizinische Aerosolformulierung | [2006/50] | English: | Medicinal aerosol formulation | [2006/50] | French: | Formulation d'aerosol medicinal | [2006/50] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99946974.5 / EP1123120 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.04.2011 | BE | 13.04.2011 | CY | 13.04.2011 | DK | 13.04.2011 | ES | 13.04.2011 | FI | 13.04.2011 | NL | 13.04.2011 | SE | 13.04.2011 | GR | 14.07.2011 | PT | 16.08.2011 | IE | 17.09.2011 | LU | 17.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | FR | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2014/33] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.09.2011 | ||
LU | 17.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 16.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9009781 (RORER INT OVERSEAS [US]) [X] 1,2,5,8-16,19,20 * page 1 * * page 5 * * page 25 - page 29; example - * * claim - *; | [X]WO9619198 (ASTRA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-6,8-20 * page 1, line 10 - line 31 * * page 2, line 9 - line 25 * * page 3, line 26 - line 30 * * page 5, line 5 - line 31 * * example - * * claim 3 *; | [A]WO9632096 (INHALE THERAPEUTIC SYST [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 4, line 23 - line 32 * * page 8, line 1 - line 16 * * page 9, line 3 - line 23 * * page 10, line 20 - line 30 ** page 15, line 1 - page 16, line 5 *; | [X]US5569450 (DUAN DANIEL C [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,11-18 * column 1, line 44 - line 67 * * column 2, line 5 - line 31 * * column 3, line 39 - line 46 * * column 4, line 40 - line 44 * * column 8, line 15 - line 34 * * examples F,1-13; table - * * claim - * |