EP1755002 - Manufacturing method of lithographic printing plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/08] | Manufacturing method of lithographic printing plate and manufacturing apparatus of lithographic printing plate | ||
[2015/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adachi, Keiichi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2016/18] |
Former [2007/08] | 01 /
Adachi, Keiichi Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/18] |
Former [2007/08] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06017167.5 | 17.08.2006 | [2007/08] | Priority number, date | JP20050237774 | 18.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005237774 | JP20060139200 | 18.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006139200 | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1755002 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1755002 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | [2007/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1755002 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/30, B41C1/10 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
B41C1/1008 (EP,US);
G03F7/305 (EP,US);
B41C1/1016 (EP,US);
B41C2201/02 (EP,US);
B41C2201/10 (EP,US);
B41C2201/12 (EP,US);
B41C2201/14 (EP,US);
B41C2210/04 (EP,US);
B41C2210/06 (EP,US);
B41C2210/10 (EP,US);
B41C2210/20 (EP,US);
B41C2210/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/18] |
Former [2007/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Flachdruckplatten | [2015/27] | English: | Manufacturing method of lithographic printing plates | [2015/30] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de plaques d'impression | [2015/27] |
Former [2007/08] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Flachdruckplatten und Herstellvorrichtung von Flachdruckplatten | ||
Former [2007/08] | Manufacturing method of lithographic printing plate and manufacturing apparatus of lithographic printing plate | ||
Former [2007/08] | Procédé pour la fabrication de plaques d'impression et appareil de fabrication de plaques d'impression | Examination procedure | 09.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 27.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10183496.8 / EP2306246 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.08.2006 | AT | 04.05.2016 | BE | 04.05.2016 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | DK | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | ES | 04.05.2016 | FI | 04.05.2016 | IS | 04.05.2016 | IT | 04.05.2016 | LT | 04.05.2016 | LV | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | NL | 04.05.2016 | PL | 04.05.2016 | RO | 04.05.2016 | SE | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | TR | 04.05.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | IE | 17.08.2016 | LU | 17.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | FR | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | PT | 05.09.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 17.08.2006 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
IE | 17.08.2016 | ||
LU | 17.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 17.08.2006 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
IE | 17.08.2016 | ||
LU | 17.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 17.08.2006 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
IE | 17.08.2016 | ||
LU | 17.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
IE | 17.08.2016 | ||
LU | 17.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 04.05.2016 | |
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 04.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1091253 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 12-17 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0056]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0110] *; | [X]EP1298495 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 12-15 * paragraph [0143] - paragraph [0179]; figure 1 *; | [X]EP1061418 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 12,13,15,17 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0415392 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 12,13,15 * column 5, line 25 - column 13, line 16; figure 1 *; | [X]EP1388760 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0053]; figure 1; example 1 *; | [PX]EP1621339 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2,5-13 * paragraph [0214] - paragraph [0226]; figure .; example -; claims 3,8,9 *; | [DA]EP1356929 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-17 * paragraph [0242]; example 1 * | Examination | US3019105 | by applicant | JP2002091016 | JP2938397B | JP2003316021 | JPS62167253 | JPH0463447 | JPH0464128 | JPH06186751 | JPH0387832 | JP2001005193 | JP2001066788 | JPH10198044 | US3905815 | JPS464605B | JPS4836281 | JPS53133428 | JPS5532070 | JPS60239736 | JPS61169835 | JPS61169837 | JPS6258241 | JPS62212401 | JPS6370243 | JPS63298339 | JPS59152396 | JPS61151197 | JPS6341484 | JPH02249 | JPH024705 | JPH0583588 | JPH01304453 | JPH01152109 | JPH0629285B | US3479185 | US4311783 | US4622286 | JPS62143044 | JPS62150242 | JPH09188685 | JPH09188686 | JPH09188710 | JP2000131837 | JP2002107916 | JP2764769B | JP2002116539 | JPH06157623 | JPH06175564 | JPH06175561 | JPH06175554 | JPH06175553 | JPH06348011 | JPH07128785 | JPH07140589 | JPH07306527 | JPH07292014 | JPS61166544 | JP2003328465 | JP2000066385 | JP2000080068 | US4069055 | JPH04365049 | US4069056 | EP0104143 | US5041358 | US4491628 | JPH02150848 | JPH02296514 | EP0370693 | EP0390214 | EP0233567 | EP0297443 | EP0297442 | US4933377 | US4760013 | US4734444 | US2833827 | DE2904626 | DE3604580 | DE3604581 | JP2001343742 | JP2002148790 | JPS58125246 | JPS5984356 | JPS6078787 | JPS58173696 | JPS58181690 | JPS58194595 | JPS58112793 | JPS58224793 | JPS5948187 | JPS5973996 | JPS6052940 | JPS6063744 | JPS58112792 | GB434875 | US5156938 | US3881924 | JPS57142645 | US4327169 | JPS58181051 | JPS58220143 | JPS5941363 | JPS5984248 | JPS5984249 | JPS59146063 | JPS59146061 | JPS59216146 | US4283475 | JPH0513514B | JPH0519702B | US4756993 | JP2001133969 | JP2002278057 | JPH0547095B | JP2000147763 | JP2001100412 | JPS5928329B | JPS5147334B | JPS57196231 | JPS595240 | JPS595241 | JPH02226149 | JPH01165613 | JPS5421726B | JPS4841708B | JPS5137193 | JPH0232293B | JPH0216765B | JPS5849860B | JPS5617654B | JPS6239417B | JPS6239418B | JPS63277653 | JPS63260909 | JPH01105238 | JPS4864183 | JPS4943191B | JPS5230490B | JPS4643946B | JPH0140337B | JPH0140336B | JPH0225493 | JPS6122048 | JPH09236913 | JP2001277740 | JP2001277742 | US2800457 | US2800458 | US3287154 | JP3819574B | JPS42446B | US3418250 | US3660304 | US3796669 | US3914511 | US4001140 | US4087376 | US4089802 | US4025445 | JPS369163B | JPS519079B | GB930422 | US3111407 | GB952807 | GB967074 | JPS62170950 | JPS62226143 | JPS60168144 | JPS62293247 | US3458311 | JPS5549729B | JPS5463902 | JP2001253181 | JP2001322365 | US2714066 | US3181461 | US3280734 | US3902734 | JP3622063B | US3276868 | US4153461 | US4689272 | JP2001199175 | JP2002079772 | JPH10282679 | JPH02304441 | JPH0545885 | JPH0635174 | - WAKABAYASHI, BULL. CHEM. SOC. JAPAN, (1969), vol. 42, page 2924 | - M.P. HUTT, JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, (1970), vol. 1, no. 3 | - J. C.S. PERKIN II, (1979), pages 1653 - 1660 | - J. C.S. PERKIN II, (1979), pages 156 - 162 | - JOURNAL OF PHOTOPOLYMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1995), pages 202 - 232 | - S.I. SCHLESINGER, PHOTOGR. SCI. ENG., (1974), vol. 18, page 387 | - T.S. BAL, POLYMER, (1980), vol. 21, page 423 | - J. V. CRIVELLO, MACROMOLECULES, (1977), vol. 10, no. 6, page 1307 | - J. V. CRIVELLO, J. POLYMER SCI., POLYMER CHEM. ED., (1979), vol. 17, page 1047 | - C.S. WEN, TEH. PROC. CONF. RAD. CURING ASIA, (198810), page 478 | - KINZOKU SEKKEN NO SEISHITSU TO OYO (NATURES AND APPLICATIONS OF METAL SOAPS, SAIWAI SHOBO CO., LTD. | - BULLETIN OF NIPPON SETCHAKU KYOKAI, (1984), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 300 - 308 | US20010002925 | US19700044563 |