EP1762276 - Trip device to trip a closing member which seals at least one duct of an air system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wildeboer, Werner Marker Weg 13 a 26826 Weener / DE | [2007/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | Jabbusch, Matthias, et al Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 85 26131 Oldenburg / DE | [2015/15] |
Former [2007/11] | Jabbusch, Matthias, et al Jabbusch Arendt & Siekmann Patentanwälte Koppelstrasse 3 26135 Oldenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06017310.1 | 19.08.2006 | [2007/11] | Priority number, date | DE20051043109 | 10.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005043109 | [2007/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1762276 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1762276 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1762276 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A62C2/24, F16K17/38 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
A62C2/242 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/11] | A62C2/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/11] | Title | German: | Auslöseeinrichtung zum Auslösen zumindest eines eine Leitung eines lufttechnischen Systems verschliessenden Absperrelementes | [2007/11] | English: | Trip device to trip a closing member which seals at least one duct of an air system | [2007/11] | French: | Mécanisme de déclenchement pour un elément obturateur fermant au moins un conduit d'une installation d'aérage | [2007/11] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 28.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2006 | BG | 08.04.2015 | CY | 08.04.2015 | DK | 08.04.2015 | EE | 08.04.2015 | ES | 08.04.2015 | LT | 08.04.2015 | LV | 08.04.2015 | MC | 08.04.2015 | RO | 08.04.2015 | SI | 08.04.2015 | GR | 09.07.2015 | IS | 08.08.2015 | PT | 10.08.2015 | GB | 19.08.2015 | IE | 19.08.2015 | LU | 19.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | FR | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/36] | DK | 08.04.2015 | |
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
GB | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | DK | 08.04.2015 | |
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
GB | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | DK | 08.04.2015 | |
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
IE | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | DK | 08.04.2015 | |
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | DK | 08.04.2015 | |
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | DK | 08.04.2015 | |
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | DK | 08.04.2015 | |
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | DK | 08.04.2015 | |
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 08.04.2015 | |
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 08.04.2015 | |
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0126107 (HALTON OY [FI]) [X] 1,12 * column 3, line 20 - column 5, line 2 * * figure 4 * [A] 2-4,6,7,13,16-18; | [DA]DE2031456 (DAITO SEISAKUSHO) [DA] 1 * page 8, paragraph 1 * * figures 4,5 *; | [A]DE7328137U (NORDLUFT H WITTENMEIER) [A] 1 * figures 3,4,7 * | by applicant | DE2031456 | DE19510025 |