EP1785789 - Method and device for programming and controlling an electric equipment system of a piece of furniture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dewert Antriebs- und Systemtechnik GmbH Weststrasse 1 32278 Kirchlengern / DE | [2007/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Langejürgen, Stefan Hollenhagen 81 32602 Vlotho / DE | 02 /
Loley, Steffen Dörper Feldweg 33 48565 Steinfurt / DE | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2007/20] | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 06017749.0 | 25.08.2006 | [2007/20] | Priority number, date | DE20051054843 | 15.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005054843 | [2007/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1785789 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1785789 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, A61G7/018 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
G05B19/0426 (EP);
A61G7/018 (EP);
G05B2219/23051 (EP);
G05B2219/23258 (EP);
G05B2219/23377 (EP);
G05B2219/2642 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Programmieren und Steuern einer Elektrogeräteanordnung eines Möbels | [2007/20] | English: | Method and device for programming and controlling an electric equipment system of a piece of furniture | [2007/20] | French: | Procédé et dispositif destinés à la programmation et à la commande d'un agencement d'appareils électriques d'un meuble | [2007/20] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.10.2010 | CZ | 13.10.2010 | EE | 13.10.2010 | FI | 13.10.2010 | HU | 13.10.2010 | IE | 13.10.2010 | IT | 13.10.2010 | LT | 13.10.2010 | LV | 13.10.2010 | PL | 13.10.2010 | RO | 13.10.2010 | SE | 13.10.2010 | SI | 13.10.2010 | SK | 13.10.2010 | TR | 13.10.2010 | BG | 13.01.2011 | GR | 14.01.2011 | ES | 24.01.2011 | IS | 13.02.2011 | PT | 14.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 13.10.2010 | |
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
TR | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 13.10.2010 | |
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | FI | 13.10.2010 | |
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | FI | 13.10.2010 | |
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 13.10.2010 | |
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 13.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5168441 (ONARHEIM WILLIAM G [US], et al) [Y] 2-5,7 * figures 25-30,38 * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 62 * * column 3, lines 26-32 ** column 17, line 10 - column 21, line 45 *; | [XY]EP0787475 (DEWERT ANTRIEBS SYSTEMTECH [DE]) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * column 1, lines 1-6 * * column 2, line 37 - column 4, line 19 * * column 5, lines 22-41 * [Y] 2-5,7; | [Y]US2003184595 (KODOSKY JEFFREY L [US], et al) [Y] 2-5,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0021] - [0034] * * paragraphs [0100] - [0105] * * paragraphs [0125] , [0126] * | Examination | - SVEN LINNMAN, "M3S: The Local Network for Electric Wheelchairs and Rehabilitation Equipment", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON REHABILITATION ENGINEERING, (19960901), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 188 - 192, XP011053803 |