EP1762384 - Process and device for marking in a processing machine for sheet material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states manroland AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach/Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states manroland AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | ||
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ihme, Andreas Möricke Strasse 5 49525 Lengerich / DE | 02 /
Klitza, Alexander Morschstrasse 15 55129 Mainz / DE | 03 /
Seidel, Frank Schopenhauerstrasse 41 63303 Dreieich / DE | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | Stahl, Dietmar manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Stahl, Dietmar manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach am Main / DE | ||
Former [2007/11] | Stahl, Dietmar MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Intellectual Property Bogen (IPB) Postfach 101264 63012 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 06017952.0 | 29.08.2006 | [2007/11] | Priority number, date | DE20051043241 | 09.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005043241 | [2007/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1762384 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1762384 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/46, B65H29/04 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
B41F19/00 (EP);
B41J11/0015 (EP);
B41J3/44 (EP);
B65H29/041 (EP,US);
B65H29/52 (EP);
B41J11/00214 (EP,US);
B41J11/00216 (EP,US);
B41J11/0085 (EP);
B65H2301/5111 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2007/11] | B41F13/46 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/48] |
Former [2007/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kennzeichnung von Bogenmaterial in einer Verarbeitungsmaschine | [2007/11] | English: | Process and device for marking in a processing machine for sheet material | [2007/11] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour marquer dans une machine de traitement de matériau en feuilles | [2007/11] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/46] | 03.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2004026851 (SCHAEDE JOHANNES [DE], et al) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014]; figures 10,11 * [Y] 2,9; | [Y]DE10047040 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [Y] 2,9 * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 22 *; | [A]DE4242259 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19901698 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 2 - line 7 *; | [A]EP0379879 (DONNELLEY & SONS CO [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 9, line 36 - line 55 * | by applicant | DE19704003 | DE19514259 | DE102004002132 |