EP1760345 - Tapered roller bearing assembling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/10] | Device and method for assembling tapered roller bearing | ||
[2013/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuse, Masaru c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2014/35] |
Former [2007/10] | 01 /
Fuse, Masaru c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/10] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06018112.0 | 30.08.2006 | [2007/10] | Priority number, date | JP20050249744 | 30.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005249744 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1760345 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1760345 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1760345 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/46, F16C19/36, F16C33/36, F16C43/06, F16C43/08, F16C43/04 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
F16C33/543 (EP,US);
F16C19/364 (EP,US);
F16C43/065 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49636 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49663 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4968 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49682 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49686 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49687 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53104 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/10] | F16C33/46, F16C19/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2013/46] |
Former [2007/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Montage eines Kegelrollenlagers | [2013/50] | English: | Tapered roller bearing assembling device | [2013/50] | French: | Dispositif de montage d'un palier à rouleaux côniques | [2013/50] |
Former [2007/10] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Montage eines Kegelrollenlagers | ||
Former [2007/10] | Device and method for assembling tapered roller bearing | ||
Former [2007/10] | Dispositif et procédé de montage d'un palier à rouleaux côniques | Examination procedure | 27.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 21.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.03.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5046248 (LEDERMAN FREDERICK E [US]) [X] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [X]JPS634233U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]JPH08177851 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [X] 1 * figure 6 *; | [A]JP2001208054 (NSK LTD) [A] 4,6 * figures 4,5 * | by applicant | US5046248 | JPS634233U | JPH08177851 |