EP1895743 - A method for implementing a wireless personal communication protocol for an IC Card [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Incard SA 39 Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 1228 Plan-Les-Ouates 1204 Geneva / CH | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Varone, Francesco Via Piero Gobetti, 12 81041 Bellona (Caserta) / IT | 02 /
Veneroso, Amedeo Via Marchesiello, 125 81100 Caserta / IT | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.r.l., Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06018178.1 | 31.08.2006 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1895743 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L12/56 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Implementierung eines drahtlosen persönlichen Kommunikationsprotokolls für eine IC-Karte | [2008/10] | English: | A method for implementing a wireless personal communication protocol for an IC Card | [2008/10] | French: | Procédé d'implémentation d'un protocole de communication personnel sans fil pour une carte à puce | [2008/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 09.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/52] | 21.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005109841 (RYAN DENNIS J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0022] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0134] , [0135] * * paragraphs [0221] , [0222] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2005207562 (NACHEF ARMAND [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0018] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0037] * * paragraphs [0073] - [0077] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6978157 (AMIENS CHRISTIAN [FR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0017] , [0033] * * paragraphs [0051] - [0057] * * paragraphs [0100] , [0101] * * claim 1 ** figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO2006045344 (TELECOM ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-6 * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 33 * * page 5, line 25 - page 8, line 34 * * page 11, line 17 - page 13, line 20 * * page 15, line 19 - line 29 * * page 17, line 15 - page 18, line 31 *; | [X]WO2006056220 (TELECOM ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [X] 13-15 * figures 1,3,4,6,7 * * page 4, line 6 - line L * * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2, paragraph 6 * |