EP1767291 - Hot chamber casting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oskar Frech GmbH + Co. KG Schorndorfer Strasse 32 73614 Schorndorf / DE | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erhard, Norbert, Dr.-Ing. Habichtweg 11 73547 Lorch / DE | 02 /
Kümmerle, Wilhelm Max-Reger-Weg 7 73614 Schorndorf / DE | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06018284.7 | 01.09.2006 | [2007/13] | Priority number, date | CN2005211898U | 01.09.2005 Original published format: CN 200520011898 U | [2007/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1767291 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1767291 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B22D17/02, B22D45/00 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
B22D17/02 (EP);
B22D45/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Title | German: | Warmkammer-Druckgiessmaschine | [2007/13] | English: | Hot chamber casting apparatus | [2007/13] | French: | Machine à couler sous pression à chambre chaude | [2007/13] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.01.2009 | DK | 07.01.2009 | EE | 07.01.2009 | FI | 07.01.2009 | IE | 07.01.2009 | LT | 07.01.2009 | LV | 07.01.2009 | NL | 07.01.2009 | RO | 07.01.2009 | SI | 07.01.2009 | SK | 07.01.2009 | TR | 07.01.2009 | BG | 07.04.2009 | GR | 08.04.2009 | IS | 07.05.2009 | PT | 08.06.2009 | HU | 08.07.2009 | LU | 01.09.2009 | BE | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | DK | 07.01.2009 | |
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
HU | 08.07.2009 | ||
LU | 01.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | DK | 07.01.2009 | |
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
LU | 01.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | DK | 07.01.2009 | |
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/40] | DK | 07.01.2009 | |
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 07.01.2009 | |
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | DK | 07.01.2009 | |
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | DK | 07.01.2009 | |
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | NL | 07.01.2009 | |
SI | 07.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2820538 (MOELLER GES FUER LUFT STAUB UN) [X] 1-6,10,11,12-21 * page 9, line 15 - page 13, line L; figure 3; claim - *; | [X]DE2949641 (HENSEL EISENWERK) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3423224 (DEUTSCHE VERGASER GMBH CO KG) [X] 1-6* column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 15; figure - * |