EP1772681 - A desiccant air-conditioning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN EXLAN COMPANY LIMITED 2-8, Dojima Hama-2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | [2007/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inaba, Hideo 2024-5, Tsudakadai 2-chome Okayama-shi Okayama / JP | 02 /
Maeda, Kensaku 5-1, Minami-Kibohgaoka Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Nishida, Ryosuke Saidaiji Plant Japan Exlan Company Ltd. 3-1, Kanaoka Higashimachi 3-chome Okayama-shi Okayama / JP | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06018736.6 | 07.09.2006 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | JP20050294547 | 07.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005294547 | JP20060133837 | 12.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006133837 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1772681 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1772681 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F24F5/00, F24F3/14 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
F24F3/1423 (EP,US);
F24F5/0046 (EP,US);
F24F2005/0057 (EP,US);
F24F2203/1016 (EP,US);
F24F2203/1032 (EP,US);
F24F2203/1056 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/15] |
Former [2007/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Klimaanlage mit Trockenmittel | [2007/15] | English: | A desiccant air-conditioning system | [2007/15] | French: | Système de conditionnement d'air utilisant un dessiccateur | [2007/15] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 22.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/47] | 14.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5837432 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH06313632 (O M KENKYUSHO KK) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]DE20103857U (TUHH TECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2005009737 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [AD] 1* the whole document * | Examination | CH691349 | JP2005034838 |