EP1898190 - Method and apparatus for dispensing a predetermined quantity of liquid and petrol pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scheidt & Bachmann GmbH Breite Strasse 132 D-41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2008/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laumen, Heinz Oberstrasse 35 52538 Gangelt / DE | 02 /
Höffges, Peter Stopfsweg 54 41176 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Intellectual Property Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06018951.1 | 11.09.2006 | [2008/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1898190 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01G17/06 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
G01G17/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Abgabe einer exakt definierten Flüssigkeitsmenge und Zapfsäule | [2008/11] | English: | Method and apparatus for dispensing a predetermined quantity of liquid and petrol pump | [2008/11] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de distribution d'une quantité prédéterminée de liquide et pompe à essence | [2008/11] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5953923 (DAVIES ANDREW FRANCIS [AU]) [X] 1-9,17,29,30 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 45 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 * [Y] 9-16,18-28,31-33; | [XY]WO9118327 (KODAK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-8,17,29,30 * page 3, line 30 - page 5, line 4 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 9-16,18-28,31-33; | [X]EP0557063 (KODAK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,17 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE3143919 (PFISTER GMBH [DE]) [Y] 33 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2003019885 (LUEHRSEN ROBERT A [US], et al) [Y] 10-16,18-28,31,32 * the whole document * |