EP1770285 - Equipment holder with suction cup and piston-cylinder assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Richter, Harald Höhenstrasse 32 75331 Engelsbrand / DE | [2007/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Gallo, Wolfgang Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Buchenweg 17 86573 Obergriesbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Gallo, Wolfgang Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ludwigstrasse 26 86152 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/14] | Gallo, Wolfgang Ludwigstrasse 26 86152 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06019120.2 | 13.09.2006 | [2007/14] | Priority number, date | DE20051046869 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005046869 | [2007/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1770285 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16B47/00 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
F16B47/00 (EP,KR,US);
F16B47/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/50] |
Former [2007/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gerätehalter-Saugfuss mit Kolben-Zylinder-Anordnung | [2007/14] | English: | Equipment holder with suction cup and piston-cylinder assembly | [2007/14] | French: | Ventouse à utiliser pour un support d'outil avec un ensemble cylindre-piston | [2007/14] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/17] | 28.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6045111 (HSIEH TSUNG-HSI [TW]) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US6478271 (MULHOLLAND IAN [GB]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE202004005825U (AUDIOTON KABELWERK SCHEINFELD [DE]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]US2004124325 (KWOK CHIN-PANG [HK]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |