EP1783668 - Transponder unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harting Mitronics AG Leugenestrasse 10 2500 Biel 6 / CH | [2007/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hehlgans, Jörg Stadtweg 20 31199 Diekholzen / DE | 02 /
Baraldi, Luca, Dr. Lickweg 4 3052 Zollikofen / CH | 03 /
Eggimann, Reto Sonnhalde 7 2555 Brügg / CH | 04 /
Patry, Christian Vennerstrasse 15 3210 Kerzens / CH | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/19] | Sties, Jochen Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06019370.3 | 15.09.2006 | [2007/19] | Priority number, date | DE20052015382U | 29.09.2005 Original published format: DE 202005015382 U | DE20062006954U | 02.05.2006 Original published format: DE 202006006954 U | [2007/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1783668 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1783668 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
G06K19/07775 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K19/07779 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Title | German: | Transpondereinheit | [2007/19] | English: | Transponder unit | [2007/19] | French: | Unité de transpondeur | [2007/19] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 24.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/41] | 08.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO0021031 (INTERMEC IP CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * abstract * * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 18 * * page 8, line 26 - page 10, line 27 * * claims 1-3,5-7,11-15 * * figures 1a,1b,2a,2b,4a * [A] 5,9; | [A]EP1237288 (BUNERT PETER [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 28 - column 8, line 18 *; | [A]EP0769765 (SCHEIDT & BACHMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 43 - column 5, line 18 * * claims 1,9,11 * |