EP1764926 - Analog signal processing circuit and communication device therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuchie, Koji c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hamada, Mototsugu c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Namekata, Minoru c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Unekawa, Yasuo c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06019377.8 | 15.09.2006 | [2007/12] | Priority number, date | JP20050270300 | 16.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005270300 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1764926 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1764926 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1764926 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/26 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
H04B1/28 (EP,US);
H04B1/0014 (EP,US);
H04B1/0032 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/32] |
Former [2007/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Analoge Signalverarbeitungsschaltung und Kommunikationsgerät damit | [2007/12] | English: | Analog signal processing circuit and communication device therewith | [2007/12] | French: | Circuit de traitement de signal circuit de traitement d'un signal analogique et appareil de communication avec ledit circuit | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.09.2009 | [2010/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0011800 (STANFORD TELECOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8-12,14,18-20 * page 3, lines 4,-11; figure 3; claim 1 * [Y] 7,8,17,18; | [X]GB2338853 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,2,4,9,11,12,14,19 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 8; figure 1 *; | [X]DE10315408 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,4,14 * page 3, paragraph 19; figure 2 *; | [Y]WO9945636 (CONEXANT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 7,8,17,18 * page 6, lines 1-8; figure 5 * |