EP1741397 - Bone plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2016 | Opposition rejected | published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthes GmbH Eimattstrasse 3 4436 Oberdorf / CH | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Rolf Gummenacher 1B 2562 Port / CH | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Höhfeld, Jochen Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [2011/27] |
Former [2009/43] | Rosenich, Paul Patentbüro Paul Rosenich AG BGZ 9497 Triesenberg / LI | ||
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/44] | Altenburg, Udo Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Peterreins, Frank Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06019616.9 | 26.08.2003 | [2007/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1741397 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1741397 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | [2007/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1741397 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/80 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
A61B17/8052 (EP,US);
A61B17/80 (KR,US);
A61B17/8033 (US);
A61B17/58 (KR);
A61B17/68 (KR);
A61B17/8057 (EP,US);
A61F2/28 (KR);
A61L27/18 (US);
A61L31/06 (EP,US);
A61L2430/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, C08L77/12 (US);
A61L31/06, C08L71/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Title | German: | Knochenplatte | [2007/02] | English: | Bone plate | [2007/02] | French: | Plaque d'ostéosynthèse | [2007/02] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.03.2010 | 17.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03818256.4 / EP1658015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.04.2011
21.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Wolter, Dietmar Viehkaten 4 22955 Hoisdorf / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.04.2011
21.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Wolter, Dietmar Viehkaten 4 22955 Hoisdorf / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.04.2011
21.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Wolter, Dietmar Viehkaten 4 22955 Hoisdorf / DE Opponent's representative Harlfinger, Jan Philipp Glawe - Delfs - Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | 17.06.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.10.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.01.2013 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.01.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.04.2016 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2016/34] | 13.07.2016 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 21.03.2013 | Appeal received No. T0750/13 | 28.05.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.04.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form | 19.03.2013 | Appeal received No. T0750/13 | 21.05.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.04.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form | 20.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.04.2016 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.07.2010 | CZ | 14.07.2010 | DK | 14.07.2010 | EE | 14.07.2010 | FI | 14.07.2010 | IE | 14.07.2010 | NL | 14.07.2010 | RO | 14.07.2010 | SE | 14.07.2010 | SI | 14.07.2010 | SK | 14.07.2010 | TR | 14.07.2010 | AT | 26.08.2010 | LU | 26.08.2010 | BE | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | BG | 14.10.2010 | GR | 15.10.2010 | PT | 15.11.2010 | HU | 15.01.2011 | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/32] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | FI | 14.07.2010 | |
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | NL | 14.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0530585 (SYNTHES AG [CH]) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 31 - line 52 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 34 * * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 11 * * column 6, line 15 - line 35 * * column 6, line 46 - line 54 * * column 7, line 4 - line 15 * * figures 1a-b,2,3,4b *; | [X]DE4343117 (WOLTER DIETMAR [DE]) [X] 1-11 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 19 * * column 5, line 10 - line 17 * * column 5, line 24 - line 26 * * claims 3,5,9,11,17,18 * * figures 1,7,8 *; | [E]WO2005018472 (MATHYS MEDIZINALTECHNIK AG [CH], et al) [E] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2007014279 (SMITH & NEPHEW INC [US], et al) [E] 1-6,9* page 12, line 9 - line 17; figure 3 * | by applicant | DE19832513 |