EP1903716 - Selective detailed representation of devices on a network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eichner, Ingo Schlesienstrasse 6 91413 Neustadt/Aisch / DE | [2008/13] | Application number, filing date | 06019816.5 | 21.09.2006 | [2008/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1903716 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1903716 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
H04L41/22 (EP,US);
G05B19/41885 (EP,US);
H04L41/12 (US);
G05B2219/31098 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/49] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Selektive Detaildarstellung von Geräten an einem Netzwerk | [2008/13] | English: | Selective detailed representation of devices on a network | [2008/13] | French: | Représentation détaillée et sélective d'appareils en réseau | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 24.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5821937 (TONELLI DANIEL L [US], et al) [Y] 4,13 * abstract * * figures 11,31,34,38 * * column 7, lines 32-49 * * column 8, lines 55-64 * * column 9, lines 4-7 * [A] 1-3,5-12,14-19; | [A]US5971581 (GRETTA ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * column 3, line 32 - column 5, line 5 ** claim 1 *; | [YA]US2002113816 (MITCHELL FREDERICK H [US], et al) [Y] 5,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] * * paragraph [0054] * * figures 3,4 * [A] 1-4,6-13,15-19; | [A]EP1398905 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0012] * * claims 1,2 *; | [XAY] - CISCCO SYSTEMS, "GETTING STARTED WITH CISCO NETWORK ASSISTANT", CISCO SYSTEMS, San Jose, California, (20050101), URL: http://www.cisco.com/univercd/cc/td/doc/product/rtrmgmt/cna/v3_0/gsg/cnags_3.pdf, (20070502), XP002432063 [X] 1-3,7,10-12,16,19 * pages 1-1, line 1 - pages 1-1, line L * * figures 2.1,2.2,2.3 * * pages 2-2, line 1 - pages 2-2, line L * [A] 6,8,9,15,17,18 [Y] 4,5,13,14 |