EP1903321 - Semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grundfos Management a/s Poul Due Jensens Vej 7-11 8850 Bjerringbro / DK | [2011/07] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states Grundfos Management A/S Poul Due Jensens Vej 7 - 11 8850 Bjerringbro / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eriksen, Gert Friis Bredager 72 2670 Greve / DK | 02 /
de Reus, Roger Marienborg Allé 54 2860 Søborg / DK | 03 /
Christensen, Carsten Marsk Stigs Allé 25 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2009/20] |
Former [2008/13] | 01 /
Eriksen, Gert Friis Bredager 72 2670 Greve / DK | Representative(s) | Vollmann, Heiko, et al Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB Wallstrasse 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Vollmann, Heiko, et al Patentanwälte Wilcken & Vollmann Bei der Lohmühle 23 23554 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 06019996.5 | 25.09.2006 | [2008/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1903321 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1903321 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01L19/06, G01L9/00 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
G01L9/0042 (EP,US);
H01L29/8605 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelement | [2008/13] | English: | Semiconductor device | [2008/13] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 01.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.02.2011 | CZ | 16.02.2011 | DK | 16.02.2011 | EE | 16.02.2011 | FI | 16.02.2011 | HU | 16.02.2011 | IE | 16.02.2011 | IS | 16.02.2011 | LT | 16.02.2011 | LV | 16.02.2011 | NL | 16.02.2011 | PL | 16.02.2011 | RO | 16.02.2011 | SE | 16.02.2011 | SI | 16.02.2011 | SK | 16.02.2011 | TR | 16.02.2011 | BG | 16.05.2011 | GR | 17.05.2011 | ES | 27.05.2011 | PT | 16.06.2011 | AT | 25.09.2011 | LU | 25.09.2011 | BE | 30.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
TR | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
AT | 25.09.2011 | ||
LU | 25.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
AT | 25.09.2011 | ||
LU | 25.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
AT | 25.09.2011 | ||
LU | 25.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
AT | 25.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 16.02.2011 | |
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0736757 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-21* column 7, line 35 - column 8, line 5; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0801150 (GRUNDFOS AS [DK]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]DE19842105 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-21 * column 1, line 17 - line 18; figure 1 * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 4 *; | [A]EP1217095 (ALSTOM POWER NV [NL]) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018]; figure 1 * |