EP1769877 - Process and device for producing a weldment between the surfaces of two flat workpieces, with total running of the contacting surface of the friction stir tool into the surface of the second workpiece opposing the first workpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GKSS-Forschungszentrum Geesthacht GmbH Max-Planck-Strasse 1 21502 Geesthacht / DE | [2007/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roos, Arne Dorfstrasse 25 21483 Juliusburg / DE | 02 /
dos Santos, Jorge F. Deichstrasse Ost 20 21395 Avendorf / DE | [2010/21] |
Former [2007/14] | 01 /
dos Santos, Jorge F. Deichstrasse Ost 20 21395 Avendorf / DE | ||
02 /
Roos, Arne Dorfstrasse 25 21483 Juliusburg / DE | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/14] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06020028.4 | 25.09.2006 | [2007/14] | Priority number, date | DE20051045954 | 26.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005045954 | [2007/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1769877 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1769877 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B23K20/12, B29C65/02, B29C65/06, // B23K101/18, B23K103/18 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
B23K20/1265 (EP,US);
B23K20/122 (EP,US);
B23K20/1255 (EP,US);
B23K20/126 (EP,US);
B23K2101/18 (EP,US);
B23K2103/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen einer Schweissverbindung zwischen den Oberflächen zweier flächiger Werkstücke mit vollständigem Verlaufen des Kontaktbereiches des drehenden Reibrührwerkzeugs in der vom ersten Werkstück abgewandten Oberfläche des zweiten Werkstückes | [2007/14] | English: | Process and device for producing a weldment between the surfaces of two flat workpieces, with total running of the contacting surface of the friction stir tool into the surface of the second workpiece opposing the first workpiece | [2007/14] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour réaliser une liaison soudée entre deux pièces plates, avec une impression complète de la surface de contact de l'outill de friction agitation dans la surface de la deuxiéme pièce opposée à la première pièce | [2007/14] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.06.2010 | CZ | 02.06.2010 | DK | 02.06.2010 | EE | 02.06.2010 | FI | 02.06.2010 | IE | 02.06.2010 | LT | 02.06.2010 | LV | 02.06.2010 | NL | 02.06.2010 | PL | 02.06.2010 | RO | 02.06.2010 | SI | 02.06.2010 | SK | 02.06.2010 | TR | 02.06.2010 | BG | 02.09.2010 | GR | 03.09.2010 | LU | 25.09.2010 | BE | 30.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | IS | 02.10.2010 | PT | 04.10.2010 | HU | 03.12.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
TR | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
LU | 25.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
LU | 25.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | FI | 02.06.2010 | |
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3831262 (LUC P) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10,14,15,19-22,29-31,33,34,37,39 * column 1, line 27 - column 5, line 52; figure 1; examples 1,5 * [A] 11; | [Y]JPH10225781 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP) [Y] 16-18,43,44 * abstract *; | [YA]WO9845080 (ESAB AB [SE], et al) [Y] 5,6,8,9,22,33-35,37,42 * page 4, line 26 - page 6, column 7; figure . * [A] 7,36; | [XY]DE19731638 (SCHAAF ANDREAS [DE]) [X] 1,2,9,12,20,21,23,24 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 8; figures 1-4 * [Y] 5,6,8,9,16-18,22,25-28,33-35,37,42-44; | [Y]DE19746812 (SUTHOFF BURKHARD PROF DR DR [DE], et al) [Y] 28 * column 1, lines 48-54; figure - *; | [Y]US2002125297 (STOL ISRAEL [US], et al) [Y] 5,7,8,33,36,38 * paragraph [0044] *; | [X]US2002158109 (GENDOH TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,9,12,13* paragraphs [0060] - [0063] - [0071] - [0081]; figures 1,6,8a-c,9a-c,10 *; | [Y]JP2003326371 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 25-27 * abstract *; | [XY]WO2004110692 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,12,13 * abstract * [Y] 5,7,8,10,11,20-25,33,36,38-40; | [YA]JP2005034863 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 10,11,20-24,39,40 * abstract * [A] 41; | [XP]US2006138197 (AOTA KINYA [JP], et al) [XP] 1-3,12,13 * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] , [0045]; figures 1,2,5,9 * | by applicant | US3831262 | WO9310935 | JPH10225781 | WO9845080 | DE19731638 | WO9912694 | DE19746812 | WO0136144 | JP2003326371 |