EP1772668 - Highly integrated power LED lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TERZA LUCE S.R.L. Via Medici del Vascello 26 20138 Milano / IT | [2007/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mingozzi, Fabrizio Via Novara, 39 28868 Varzo (Prov. of Verbania) / IT | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Alagem Modiano, Lara S., et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Alagem Modiano, Lara S., et al Modiano & Associati Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06020210.8 | 27.09.2006 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | IT2005MI01874 | 05.10.2005 Original published format: IT MI20051874 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1772668 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F21V29/00, F21K7/00 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
F21V29/75 (EP,US);
F21V29/503 (US);
F21K9/233 (EP,US);
F21V29/763 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Title | German: | Led Lampe in kompakter Bauart | [2007/15] | English: | Highly integrated power LED lamp | [2007/15] | French: | Lampe à LED de fabrication compacte | [2007/15] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/46] | 23.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/46] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.02.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 16.02.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE10333907 (SIGNAL CONSTRUCT ELEKTRO OPTIS [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-7 * paragraphs [0012] , [0018] , [0021] , [0057] * * figures 7b,8b * [Y] 2; | [YA]WO2005078338 (KELLY WILLIAM M [IE]) [Y] 2 * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 6 * * figure 3 *[A] 1 |