EP1770460 - Automation system with integrated safety and standard control functionality [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2007/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuster, George K. 4403 Hillcrest Royal Oak Michigan 48073 / US | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/30] | Englaender, Klaus, et al HML Patentanwälte Schraudolphstrasse 3 80799 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/14] | Jung HML Schraudolphstrasse 3 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06020481.5 | 28.09.2006 | [2007/14] | Priority number, date | US20050239948 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: US 239948 | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1770460 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1770460 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | [2009/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1770460 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/05 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
G05B19/4061 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36473 (EP,US);
G05B2219/49152 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2010/33] |
Former [2007/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Automatisierungssystem mit integrierter Sicherheits- und Standardsteuerfunktionalität | [2007/14] | English: | Automation system with integrated safety and standard control functionality | [2007/14] | French: | Système d'automatisme avec fonctionalité de sécurité et de contrôle standard intégrée | [2012/03] |
Former [2007/14] | Système d'automatisation à fonctionnalité de contrôle de sécurité et de standard | Examination procedure | 04.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 10.06.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2003050735 (GRIFFIS MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-6,8,9,11-18 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0091] * [A] 10,19 [Y] 7; | [A]US2004182574 (ADNAN SARMAD [US], et al) [A] 1-19* paragraph [0045] *; | [Y]EP1521148 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0029] * | by applicant | US2003050735 |