EP1908661 - Switchable and safe circuit for receiving and/or sending signals of an automatic train control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG Albisriederstrasse 245 8047 Zürich / CH | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumann, Rene Im langen Baum 6 8424 Embrach / CH | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Fischer, Michael Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06020886.5 | 04.10.2006 | [2008/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1908661 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B61L3/12, B61L27/00 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
B61L3/121 (EP);
B61L27/37 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/51] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Umschaltbare, sichere Einrichtung zum Empfangen und/oder Aussenden von Signalen zur Zugbeeinflussung auf einem Schienenfahrzeug | [2008/15] | English: | Switchable and safe circuit for receiving and/or sending signals of an automatic train control system | [2008/15] | French: | Circuit sûr et commutable pour recevoir et/ou émettre des signaux d'un système de commande de la marche de train | [2008/15] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/16] | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9411791U (METROPOLITANA MILANESE STRUTTU [IT], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 16; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2004049327 (KONDRATENKO ROBERT ALLEN [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0012] - [0021] *; | [A]WO2005007481 (BOMBARDIER TRANSP PPC GERMANY [DE]) [A] 1* page 10, line 7 - page 15, line 2; figure 5 *; | [A]EP1614604 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0021] - [0024]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1681222 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0003] - [0009]; figure . *; | [A] - MÜLLER T ET AL, "ETCS-Migration in der schweiz mit Balisengerät", SIGNAL + DRAHT, TELZLAFF VERLAG GMBH. DARMSTADT, DE, (20020101), vol. 94, no. 1-2, ISSN 0037-4997, pages 31 - 32, XP002361845 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - ZUEND A ET AL, "DIE NETZWEITE UMSETZUNG VON ETCS IN DER SCHWEIZ", SIGNAL + DRAHT, TETZLAFF, HAMBURG, DE, (200607), ISSN 0037-4997, pages 6 - 9, XP001244501 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - DRAEGER U, "ETCS UND DER UEBERGANG ZU DEN NATIONALEN ZUGSICHERUNGSSYSTEMEN DER DB AG", SIGNAL + DRAHT, TETZLAFF, HAMBURG, DE, (200411), vol. 96, no. 11, ISSN 0037-4997, pages 6 - 15, XP001205535 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |