EP1775339 - Aqueous cleaning composition and method for using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Air Products and Chemicals, Inc. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wu, Aiping 2142 Rolling Meadow Drive Macungie PA 18062 / US | 02 /
Rovito, Roberto, John 1435 Beverly Drive Quakertown PA 18951 / US | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/16] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06020949.1 | 05.10.2006 | [2007/16] | Priority number, date | US20050249207 | 13.10.2005 Original published format: US 249207 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1775339 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1775339 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C11D11/00, C11D7/04, H01L21/02, G03F7/42 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
C11D3/0073 (EP,KR,US);
C11D1/40 (KR);
C11D1/62 (KR);
C11D7/06 (EP,US);
C11D7/10 (EP,US);
C11D7/34 (EP,US);
G03F7/42 (KR);
G03F7/425 (EP,US);
H01L21/02057 (EP,US);
H01L21/02063 (EP,US);
H01L21/02071 (EP,US);
C11D2111/14 (KR);
C11D2111/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Title | German: | Wässrige Reinigungszusammensetzung und Verwendungsmethode | [2007/16] | English: | Aqueous cleaning composition and method for using same | [2007/16] | French: | Produit de nettoyage aqueux et procédé d'utilisation correspondant | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 14.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2006 | AT | 16.11.2011 | BE | 16.11.2011 | CY | 16.11.2011 | CZ | 16.11.2011 | DK | 16.11.2011 | EE | 16.11.2011 | FI | 16.11.2011 | IT | 16.11.2011 | LT | 16.11.2011 | LV | 16.11.2011 | NL | 16.11.2011 | PL | 16.11.2011 | RO | 16.11.2011 | SE | 16.11.2011 | SI | 16.11.2011 | SK | 16.11.2011 | TR | 16.11.2011 | BG | 16.02.2012 | GR | 17.02.2012 | ES | 27.02.2012 | IS | 16.03.2012 | PT | 16.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 16.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9810050 (OLIN MICROELECTRONIC CHEM INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-13 * page 1, lines 2-8; examples 1-5; claims 1-3,6-8 * * page 2, line 31 - page 4, line 2 * * page 6, lines 15-33 * [Y] 1-14; | [Y]WO9915345 (OLIN MICROELECTRONIC CHEM INC [US]) [Y] 14* examples 1-3 *; | [Y]WO9960083 (ARCH SPEC CHEM INC [US]) [Y] 1-14 * page 1, lines 7-10; claims 1,5,7-25 * * page 7, lines 7-24 *; | [A]US6313039 (SMALL ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * example 19; claim 9 *; | [XY]US2004234904 (RIEKER JENNIFER M [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,10-13 * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] - [0014] - [0036] , [0050] , [0051]; claims 1,10,11 * [Y] 1-14 |