EP1782710 - A discharge structure of the cosmetics brush [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Byun, Young Kwang 928-1005, Mok-dong, Apt. 312 Shinjeong-dong, Yangcheon-gu Seoul 158-769 / KR | [2007/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Strobel, Wolfgang, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | Strobel, Wolfgang, et al Kroher . Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06021088.7 | 06.10.2006 | [2007/19] | Priority number, date | KR20050104670 | 03.11.2005 Original published format: KR 20050104670 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1782710 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1782710 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A45D33/02, A46B11/00 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
A45D33/02 (EP,KR,US);
A46B11/0058 (EP,KR,US);
A45D33/34 (EP,KR,US);
A46B2200/1046 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/46] |
Former [2007/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Auslassvorrichtung einer Kosmetikbürste | [2007/19] | English: | A discharge structure of the cosmetics brush | [2007/19] | French: | Dispositif de décharge de brosse cosmétique | [2007/19] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/10] | 14.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0683062 (PENTEL KK [JP]) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 4-10 * * column 14, lines 20-47; figure 8 *; | [A]JP2001341487 (PENTEL KK) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]EP1568296 (BYUN YOUNG-CHUL [KR]) [A] 1-4* the whole document * |