EP1797976 - Conical bubble brick [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PA-HA-GE Feuerfeste Erzeugnisse GmbH & Co. KG Holtweg 17/19 41749 Viersen / DE | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schraven, Thomas, Dr. Minkweg 12 a 47803 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Schrader, Peter Oderstrasse 25 41749 Viersen / DE | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Lenzing, Andreas Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Bahnstrasse 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | Lenzing, Andreas Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Bahnstrasse 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06021283.4 | 11.10.2006 | [2007/25] | Priority number, date | DE20051060432 | 15.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005060432 | [2007/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1797976 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1797976 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B22D1/00 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
B22D1/005 (EP);
C21C5/48 (EP);
F27D3/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Title | German: | Spülkegel | [2007/25] | English: | Conical bubble brick | [2007/25] | French: | Pierre de lavage à gaz | [2007/25] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 21.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/16] | 02.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0080403 (USINOR [FR]) [X] 1-6 * page 4, line 7 - page 8, line 31; figures 1-3 * [Y] 7,8; | [Y]US5573724 (SOOFI MADJID [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * column 3, line 22 - column 7, line 3; figures 1-10 *; | [Y]DE19619204 (VEITSCH RADEX AG [AT]) [Y] 7,8* column 4, lines 11-18 * |