EP1775798 - Holdercontact for a spring contact and resilient contact [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Automotive Electronics & Components GmbH Industriestrasse 2-8 78315 Radolfzell / DE | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states TRW Automotive Electronics & Components GmbH & Co. KG Am Pulverhäuschen 7 67677 Enkenbach/Alsenborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kolb, Ulli Hofstrasse 19 67678 Mehlingen / DE | 02 /
Zajak, Martin Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 25 67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | 03 /
Naumann, Karl-Heinz Bergwies 6 66887 Jettenbach / DE | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/16] | Sties, Jochen Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06021334.5 | 11.10.2006 | [2007/16] | Priority number, date | DE20052016024U | 12.10.2005 Original published format: DE 202005016024 U | [2007/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1775798 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1775798 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/24 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
H01R13/2421 (EP);
H01R43/16 (EP);
H01R2201/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Title | German: | Kontaktteilhalter für einen Federkontakt und Federkontakt | [2007/16] | English: | Holdercontact for a spring contact and resilient contact | [2007/16] | French: | Support de contact pour un contact élastique et contact avec ressort | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 24.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.09.2010 | DK | 29.09.2010 | EE | 29.09.2010 | FI | 29.09.2010 | IE | 29.09.2010 | LT | 29.09.2010 | LV | 29.09.2010 | NL | 29.09.2010 | PL | 29.09.2010 | RO | 29.09.2010 | SE | 29.09.2010 | SI | 29.09.2010 | LU | 11.10.2010 | BE | 31.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | BG | 29.12.2010 | GB | 29.12.2010 | GR | 30.12.2010 | IS | 29.01.2011 | PT | 31.01.2011 | HU | 30.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/44] | BG | 29.09.2010 | |
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LU | 11.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GB | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 29.09.2010 | |
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GB | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 29.09.2010 | |
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GB | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GB | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | DK | 29.09.2010 | |
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GB | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | DK | 29.09.2010 | |
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | DK | 29.09.2010 | |
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | EE | 29.09.2010 | |
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | EE | 29.09.2010 | |
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/16] | FI | 29.09.2010 | |
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | FI | 29.09.2010 | |
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | LT | 29.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6340320 (OGAWA SHINGO [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-9; | [X]DE10261733 (IMS CONNECTOR SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US6923690 (WANG ERIC [TW]) [A] 1-9* the whole document * |