EP1777822 - Semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR, GB | published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [2019/13] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukumoto, Ryota Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / US | 02 /
Osame, Mitsuaki Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / US | 03 /
Miyake, Hiroyuki Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / US | 04 /
Tanada, Yoshifumi Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / US | 05 /
Amano, Seiko Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / US | [2019/13] |
Former [2007/17] | 01 /
Fukumoto, Ryota Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / US | ||
02 /
Osame, Mitsuaki Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / US | |||
03 /
Miyake, Hiroyuki Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / US | |||
04 /
Tanada, Yoshifumi Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / US | |||
05 /
Amano, Seiko Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/13] |
Former [2007/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06021360.0 | 11.10.2006 | [2007/17] | Priority number, date | JP20050307856 | 21.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005307856 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1777822 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1777822 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | [2009/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1777822 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/528, H01L23/50, H03K19/003 | [2009/06] | CPC: |
G09G3/20 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/1345 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/3225 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/12 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2300/0426 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2310/0275 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2330/02 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/17] | H03K19/003 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2019/13] |
Former [2009/41] | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halbleitervorricthung | [2007/17] | English: | Semiconductor device | [2007/17] | French: | Dispositif semiconducteur | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 05.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.06.2018 | 27.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 27.03.2019 | NL | 27.03.2019 | GB | 11.10.2019 | FR | 31.10.2019 | [2020/48] |
Former [2019/40] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH01243578 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1,10,19,20,29,38 * abstract * [Y] 11-18,30-37; | [XY]US5670802 (KOIKE TSUNEO [JP]) [X] 1-9,20-28 * column 6, line 43 - column 8, line 24; figures 1A,2 * [Y] 11-18,30-37; | [A]US5923089 (YAO CHINGCHI [US], et al) [A] 1-38* column 8, line 66 - column 10, line 39; figures 11,12 *; | [A]US6021081 (HIGASHIDE YOSHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-38 * column 5, line 31 - column 6, line 67; figures 3-6 * | by applicant | US5670802 |