EP1775366 - Control circuit for fabric treatment devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diehl AKO Stiftung & Co. KG Pfannerstrasse 75 88239 Wangen im Allgäu / DE | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Menniger, Ralf August-Braun-Strasse 25 88239 Wangen / DE | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstraße 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2007/16] | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06021379.0 | 12.10.2006 | [2007/16] | Priority number, date | DE20051049892 | 17.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005049892 | [2007/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1775366 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1775366 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/42 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
D06F49/003 (EP,US);
D06F34/08 (EP,US);
D06F37/42 (EP,US);
Y10S388/917 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5611 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Title | German: | Schaltung zur Ansteuerung eines Geräts zur Wäschebehandlung | [2007/16] | English: | Control circuit for fabric treatment devices | [2007/16] | French: | Circuit de réglage pour dispositifs de traitement de tissus | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 19.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.12.2010 | CZ | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | FI | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | IE | 22.12.2010 | LT | 22.12.2010 | LV | 22.12.2010 | NL | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SE | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | BG | 22.03.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | IS | 22.04.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 22.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2048314 (TI DOMESTIC APPLIANCES LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]DE3423004 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [X]EP0702103 (ELECTROLUX ZANUSSI ELETTRODOME [IT]) [X] 1-6 * Spalte 2, Zeile 42 - Spalte 4, Zeile 38; Anspruch 1; Zusammenfassung; Abbildungen *; | [X]DE19953633 (DIEHL AKO STIFTUNG GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-6 * Spalte 1, Zeile 29 - Spalte 2, Zeile 64; Ansprüche; Zusammenfassung; Abbildung 1 * |