EP1780448 - Control apparatus and method for continuously-variable transmission of vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/18] | Control apparatus for continuously-variable transmission of vehicle | ||
[2010/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JATCO Ltd 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Midori c/o JATCO LTD 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 02 /
Kodama, Yoshihisa c/o JATCO LTD 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 03 /
Iida, Toshiji c/o JATCO LTD 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 04 /
Shibuya, Toshiyuki c/o JATCO LTD 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 05 /
Ozone, Tatsuya c/o JATCO LTD 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06021472.3 | 12.10.2006 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | JP20050317644 | 31.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005317644 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1780448 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1780448 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1780448 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/662 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
F16H61/66272 (EP,US);
F16H2061/66281 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2011/06] |
Former [2007/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuergerät und -Verfahren für stufenloses Fahrzeuggetriebe | [2010/30] | English: | Control apparatus and method for continuously-variable transmission of vehicle | [2010/30] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de commande pour transmission à variation continue de véhicule | [2010/30] |
Former [2007/18] | Steuergerät für stufenloses Fahrzeuggetriebe | ||
Former [2007/18] | Control apparatus for continuously-variable transmission of vehicle | ||
Former [2007/18] | Dispositif de commande pour transmission à variation continue de véhicule | Examination procedure | 25.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 19.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.12.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.01.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0093413 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,13 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0117264 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,13 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE3634166 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,13* column 3, line 30 - line 43 *; | [A]US5720692 (KASHIWABARA MASUO [JP]) [A] 1,13 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0892196 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,2,13 * abstract *; | [A]EP1396665 (JATCO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,13 * figure 6 * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0060] *; | [A]EP1403560 (JATCO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,13 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0028] * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2004162183 (WAKAHARA TATSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,13 * figures 2,3,4,5 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0045] * |