EP1764424 - Magnetic substrate, laminate of magnetic substrate and method for producing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nakagawa Special Steel Co., Inc 3-5-4, Tsukiji Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states Nakagawa Special Steel Co., Ltd. 3-5-4, Tsukiji Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | ||
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maruko, Nobuhiro c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Mitsunobu c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Hiroshi c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 04 /
Ono, Takashi c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 05 /
Nogi, Hidenobu c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 06 /
Nakata, Tomoyuki c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | [2011/41] |
Former [2007/12] | 01 /
Maruko, Nobuhiro c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | ||
02 /
Yoshida, Mitsunobu c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | |||
03 /
Watanabe, Hiroshi c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | |||
04 /
Ono, Takashi c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | |||
05 /
Nogi, Hidenobu c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | |||
06 /
Nakata, Tomoyuki c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/12] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06021733.8 | 15.01.2003 | [2007/12] | Priority number, date | JP20020007023 | 16.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002007023 | JP20020017609 | 25.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002017609 | JP20020089931 | 27.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002089931 | JP20020111018 | 12.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002111018 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1764424 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1764424 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C22C45/04, C21D6/00, H01F1/14, H01F1/16, H01F10/12, H01F1/153 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
H01F1/15308 (EP,US);
C22C45/04 (EP,KR,US);
C21D6/00 (KR);
C22C45/02 (EP,US);
H01F1/14 (KR);
H01F1/15316 (EP,US);
H01F1/15341 (EP,US);
H01F1/15358 (EP,US);
H01F1/15366 (EP,US);
H01F1/15383 (EP,US);
H01F1/16 (KR);
H01F41/0226 (EP,US);
C21D9/46 (EP,US);
H01F1/15375 (EP,US);
H01F17/045 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12465 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12771 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1291 (EP,US);
Y10T428/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/48] |
Former [2007/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Magnetisches Grundmaterial, Laminat aus magnetischem Grundmaterial und zugehöriges Herstellungsverfahren | [2007/12] | English: | Magnetic substrate, laminate of magnetic substrate and method for producing thereof | [2007/12] | French: | Matériau de base magnétique, lamine à base de ce matériau de base magnétique et procédé de fabrication | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 22.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03701093.1 / EP1473377 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030701093) is 21.04.2006 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS62226603 ; | [X]US4067732 (RAY RANJAN) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 15 - line 33 * * column 3, line 39 - line 41 * * column 4, line 6 - line 65 * * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 41 * * column 7 - column 10; tables I-VIII * * claims 1-13 *; | [X]GB1547461 (ALLIED CHEM) [X] 1-7 * page 2, line 39 - line 42 * * page 3, line 31 - line 65 * * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 41 * * tables I-VIII * * claims 1-21 *; | [X]US4225339 (INOMATA KOICHIRO, et al) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 25 - line 27 * * column 3, line 67 - line 68 * * column 6 - column 7; table 1 *; | [X]US4385944 (HASEGAWA RYUSUKE) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 32 - line 35 * * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 17 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US4437907 (SATO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 6; example 1 ** claims *; column 7 - column 8; table 1 *; | [DX]US5567537 (YOSHIZAWA YOSHIHITO [JP], et al) [DX] 1-7 * column 5, line 19 - line 23 * * column 6, line 6 - lines 29,65 * * column 7, line 1 - line 19 * * column 7, line 53 - column 8, line 60; table 1 * * column 9, line 5 - line 41 * * column 10, line 53 - line 54; table 3 * * column 11, line 39 - line 44; table 4 * * claims 1,2,6,7 *; | [X]WO0028556 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 3, line 9 - line 14 * * page 4, line 6 - line 18 * * page 7, line 5 - line 8 * * page 8, line 10 - line 11 * * page 9, line 6 - line 13 * * page 10 - page 11; example 1 * * page 13; example 2 * * page 14 - page 15; example 3; claims 2,3,8,11,15,16,26 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880326), vol. 012, no. 094, Database accession no. (E - 593), & JP62226603 A 19871005 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * table 1 * |