EP1779737 - Method and apparatus for controlled triggering of oxygen scavenging compositions utilizing a wrap-around shade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. 100 Rogers Bridge Road Duncan, SC 29334 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. 100 Rogers Bridge Road Duncan, S.C. 29334 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grossmann, Greg 10 Pine Gate Court Greenville, SC 29607 / US | 02 /
Verrett, Jason G. 6 Red Cedar Court Simpsonville, SC 29681 / US | 03 /
Compton, Stephen F. 107 Brian Drive Spartanburg, SC 29307 / US | 04 /
Beckwith, Scott W. 2 Rollingreen Road Greer, SC 29651 / US | [2008/24] |
Former [2007/18] | 01 /
Grossmann, Greg 10 Pine Gate Court Greenville South Carolina 29607 / US | ||
02 /
Verrett, Jason G. 6 Red Cedar Court Simpsonville South Carolina 29681 / US | |||
03 /
Compton, Stephen F. 107 Brian Drive Spartanburg South Carolina 29307 / US | |||
04 /
Beckwith, Scott W. 2 Rollingreen Road Greer South Carolina 29651 / US | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06021760.1 | 17.10.2006 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | US20050258802 | 26.10.2005 Original published format: US 258802 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1779737 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1779737 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A23L3/3436, B29C71/04, B65B31/00, B65B55/19 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
B29C71/04 (EP,US);
A23L3/3436 (EP,US);
B65B55/08 (EP,US);
B65B55/19 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0827 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur kontrollierten Aktivierung einer sauerstoffabsorbierenden Zusammensetzung mittels einer umwickelnden Abschirmung | [2008/22] | English: | Method and apparatus for controlled triggering of oxygen scavenging compositions utilizing a wrap-around shade | [2007/18] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'activation contrôlée de compositions desoxigénantes en utilisant une protection enveloppante | [2007/18] |
Former [2007/18] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur kontrolierten Aktivierung einer sauerstoffabsorbierenden Zusammenstzung mittels einer umwickelnden Abschirmung | Examination procedure | 13.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 08.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2008 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 27.03.2008 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 08.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.01.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.12.2008 | BE | 10.12.2008 | CY | 10.12.2008 | CZ | 10.12.2008 | DK | 10.12.2008 | EE | 10.12.2008 | FI | 10.12.2008 | IT | 10.12.2008 | LT | 10.12.2008 | LV | 10.12.2008 | NL | 10.12.2008 | PL | 10.12.2008 | RO | 10.12.2008 | SI | 10.12.2008 | SK | 10.12.2008 | TR | 10.12.2008 | BG | 10.03.2009 | SE | 10.03.2009 | GR | 11.03.2009 | ES | 21.03.2009 | IS | 10.04.2009 | PT | 11.05.2009 | HU | 11.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
HU | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | FI | 10.12.2008 | |
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 10.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9817535 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) [A] 1-29 * page 7, line 23 - page 9, line 6; figure - *; | [DA]US6287481 (LUTHRA NARENDER [US], et al) [DA] 1-29 * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 59; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US6449923 (COOK JR PHILIP H [US], et al) [DA] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP1598391 (CRYOVAC INC [US]) [PA] 1-29* the whole document * |