EP1801049 - Pipeswitch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coperion Waeschle GmbH & Co. KG Niederbieger Strasse 9 88250 Weingarten / DE | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zinser, Bruno Milanweg 3 88289 Waldburg / DE | 02 /
Schädler, Manfred Im Egert 13 88213 Ravensburg / DE | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Matthias, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Hofmann, Matthias, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06021792.4 | 18.10.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | DE20051061432 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005061432 | [2007/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801049 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1801049 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65G53/56, F16K11/083 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
B65G53/56 (EP);
F16K11/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Title | German: | Rohrweiche | [2007/26] | English: | Pipeswitch | [2007/26] | French: | Aiguillage de tuyaux | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 03.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.07.2008 | CZ | 16.07.2008 | DK | 16.07.2008 | EE | 16.07.2008 | FI | 16.07.2008 | IE | 16.07.2008 | IT | 16.07.2008 | LT | 16.07.2008 | LV | 16.07.2008 | PL | 16.07.2008 | RO | 16.07.2008 | SI | 16.07.2008 | SK | 16.07.2008 | TR | 16.07.2008 | BG | 16.10.2008 | SE | 16.10.2008 | GR | 17.10.2008 | AT | 18.10.2008 | LU | 18.10.2008 | ES | 27.10.2008 | BE | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | IS | 16.11.2008 | PT | 16.12.2008 | HU | 17.01.2009 | [2011/03] |
Former [2010/41] | CY | 16.07.2008 | |
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
TR | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
AT | 18.10.2008 | ||
LU | 18.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
HU | 17.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
AT | 18.10.2008 | ||
LU | 18.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
AT | 18.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
AT | 18.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 16.07.2008 | |
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | FI | 16.07.2008 | |
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 16.07.2008 | |
IS | 16.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE1088873 (KLINGER K G) [DA] 1 * figure 1 *; | [DA]US3199537 (SWANSON ARDEN E) [DA] 1 * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0305821 (AVT ANLAGEN VERFAHRENSTECH [DE]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [DA]FR2627252 (EGRETIER JEAN MICHEL [FR]) [DA] 1 * figure 1 * |