EP1775619 - Method and device for visualising the environment of a vehicle by merging an infrared image and a visual image according to distance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states Bayerische Motorenwerke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hahn, Wolfgang Erdweger Strasse 17 85247 Schwabhausen / DE | 02 /
Weidner, Thomas Michaeliburgstrasse 16 81671 Munchen / DE | [2007/16] | Application number, filing date | 06022182.7 | 26.04.2003 | [2007/16] | Priority number, date | DE2002127171 | 18.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10227171 | [2007/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1775619 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1775619 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02B23/12, B60R11/04, B60R1/00 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
G02B23/12 (EP);
B60R1/30 (EP,US);
B60R1/24 (EP,US);
H04N23/11 (EP);
H04N7/181 (EP);
B60R2300/105 (EP);
B60R2300/106 (EP);
B60R2300/30 (EP);
B60R2300/301 (EP);
B60R2300/302 (EP);
B60R2300/304 (EP);
B60R2300/307 (EP);
B60R2300/402 (EP);
B60R2300/8033 (EP);
B60R2300/804 (EP);
B60R2300/8053 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Sichtbarmachung der Umgebung eines Fahrzeugs mit abstandsabhängiger Fusion eines Infrarot- und eines Visuell-Abbilds | [2007/16] | English: | Method and device for visualising the environment of a vehicle by merging an infrared image and a visual image according to distance | [2007/16] | French: | Procede et dispositif de visualisation de l'environnement d'un vehicule par la fusion d'une image infrarouge et d'une representation visuelle en fonction de distances | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 29.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.09.2014 | 13.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/44] | 23.06.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/44] | 18.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03759886.9 / EP1514149 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030759886) is 12.04.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0399952 ; | [X]US4086616 (CATANO PAUL S, et al); | [A]US4751571 (LILLQUIST ROBERT D [US]); | [A]US5001558 (BURLEY HARVEY A [US], et al); | [A]FR2687000 (RENAULT [FR]); | [DA]EP0686865 (DELCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]); | [A]EP1024057 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]); | [A]US6150930 (COOPER ALAN NEAL [US]); | [A]DE10030421 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO0128250 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [PA]EP1227683 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | US5852672 | US2001019482 |