EP1780916 - Method for processing multimedia broadcasting data in wireless terminal in a driving vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Soon-Jin c/o Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/11] | Hutter, Jacobus Johannes, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2007/18] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06022234.6 | 24.10.2006 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | KR20050101403 | 26.10.2005 Original published format: KR 20050101403 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1780916 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1780916 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00, H04B1/08 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
H04H40/27 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04H20/57 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/15] |
Former [2007/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von multimedialen Rundfunkdaten in einem drahtlosen Endgerät in einem fahrenden Fahrzeug | [2007/18] | English: | Method for processing multimedia broadcasting data in wireless terminal in a driving vehicle | [2007/18] | French: | Procédé à traiter des données multimediales de radiodiffusion dans un terminal sans fil dans un véhicule en mouvement | [2007/18] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 04.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.03.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/31] | 01.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/31] | 13.03.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0846588 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [Y]GB2353872 (ROKE MANOR RESEARCH [GB]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2002019533 (SONY CORP) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005128121 (KROCULICK KEVIN J [US]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A] - IBENTHAL A ET AL, MULTIMEDIA IM FAHRZEUG: DIENSTE UND TECHNIK, FKT FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK, FACHVERLAG SCHIELE & SCHON GMBH., BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 100 - 105, (20000301), ISSN 1430-9947, XP000966339 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | Examination | US2003169181 |