EP1783965 - Centralized control for configuring a wireless mesh network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/19] | Centralized line control for configuring a wireless mesh network | ||
[2012/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.01.2014 [2014/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2013/08] |
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Hidenori c/oNEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/08] |
Former [2007/19] | 01 /
Kato, Hidenori c/oNEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/19] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06022725.3 | 31.10.2006 | [2007/19] | Priority number, date | JP20050318972 | 02.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005318972 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1783965 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1783965 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1783965 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/16, // H04W84/18 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
H04W88/16 (EP,US);
H04W40/18 (EP,US);
H04W40/22 (EP,US);
H04W40/246 (EP,US);
H04W76/20 (EP,US);
H04W84/00 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/19] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2009/46] |
Former [2007/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zentralisierte Steuerung zur Konfiguration eines drahtlosen Maschennetzwerkes | [2012/28] | English: | Centralized control for configuring a wireless mesh network | [2012/28] | French: | Contrôle centralisé pour la configuration d'un réseau mallié sans fil | [2012/28] |
Former [2007/19] | Zentrale Leitungskontrolle zur Konfiguration eines drahtlosen Maschennetzwerkes | ||
Former [2007/19] | Centralized line control for configuring a wireless mesh network | ||
Former [2007/19] | Contrôle centralisé de ligne pour la configuration d'un réseau mallié sans fil | Examination procedure | 25.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 05.09.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004014025 (INTERWAVE COMMUNICATIONS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-28 * page 2, lines 7-10 * * page 4, lines 9-17 * * page 6, lines 7-13 * * page 5, lines 14,15 * * page 9, lines 7-10,21-22,29-32 * * page 10, lines 1-3; figure 3 *; | [Y]WO2005062552 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [Y] 1-28 * page 18, lines 6-12, 17-18 *; | [A] - SHOUYI YIN ET AL, "Adaptive load balancing in mobile ad hoc networks", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 2005 IEEE NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA 13-17 MARCH 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050313), vol. 4, ISBN 978-0-7803-8966-3, pages 1982 - 1987, XP010791485 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WCNC.2005.1424823 | by applicant | WO2004014025 | WO2005062552 | - SHOUYI YIN ET AL., "Adaptive load balancing in mobile ad hoc networks", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, (20050313), vol. 4, pages 1982 - 1987 |